Smith v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: David O. Smith
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2025cv00007
Filed: January 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: (1) all current deadlines are SET ASIDE; (2) plaintiff David Smiths motion to remand (DE #9 ) is DENIED as moot; and (3) the parties SHALL FILE an agreed order of dismissal or a joint status report by May 23, 2025. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/24/2025.(JMB)cc: COR
March 21, 2025 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (Millioen, Tiffany)
March 6, 2025 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by David O. Smith (JMB)
March 5, 2025 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by David O. Smith filed by David O. Smith. (Rossman, Travis)
March 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #13 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company [Extension of Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint] filed by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company: HLAICs Motion to Extend Deadline to Plead (DE #13) is GRANTED. HLAIC shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by March 24, 2025. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/4/2025.(JMB)cc: COR
February 28, 2025 Filing 13 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company [Extension of Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Millioen, Tiffany)
February 24, 2025 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by David O. Smith filed by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy)(Millioen, Tiffany)
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tiffany C. Millioen on behalf of Defendant, Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, in the above action. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/13/2025. (JMB)cc: COR
February 13, 2025 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Tiffany C. Millioen re #10 MOTION for Tiffany Millioen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-6031866). (JMB)
February 13, 2025 NOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Tiffany C. Millioen: re #11 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. A Pro Hac Vice e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Tiffany C. Millioen (JMB)
February 13, 2025 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen K. Caldwell for review: re #10 MOTION for Tiffany Millioen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-6031866) (JMB)
February 12, 2025 Filing 10 MOTION for Tiffany Millioen to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-6031866) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Tiffany Millioen, #2 Proposed Order)(Pullen, Andrew)
February 3, 2025 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by David O. Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Binding Stipulation, #2 Proposed Order)(Rossman, Travis)
February 3, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David O. Smith. (Rossman, Travis)
January 29, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: PDF DOCUMENT: Error: INCORRECT document attached to docket entry by docket clerk; Order Title Incorrect re #6 Order,, Update Answer Due Deadline,, Terminate Motions, ; Correct document attached to this entry. *jp* cc: COR (JCP)
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: HLAIC's Motion to Extend Deadline to Plead (DE #5 ) is GRANTED. HLAIC shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint by March 2, 2025. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 1/29/2025.(JCP)cc: COR and DAVID O. SMITH by US Mail (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/29/2025) (KM).
January 29, 2025 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (JCP)
January 28, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pullen, Andrew)
January 27, 2025 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JCP)
January 27, 2025 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company, filed by David O. Smith. Filed in State Court Record- See DE #1 . (JCP)
January 27, 2025 Conflict Check run. (JCP)
January 24, 2025 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Hartford Holdings, Inc. for Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company.. (JCP)
January 24, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Whitley Circuit Court, case number 24-CI-00587. ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-6018640), filed by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David O. Smith
Represented By: Travis Alan Rossman
Represented By: David O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew Pullen
Represented By: Tiffany C. Millioen
Represented By: Tiffany C. Millioen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?