Hauenstein v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Holly R. Hauenstein
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2025cv00031
Filed: February 20, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: Hanly A Ingram
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2025 Filing 10 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Holly R. Hauenstein.(Morgan-White, Alice)
April 11, 2025 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Yancey L. White and Alice Annette Morgan-White re #10 Disclosures; Signature on document and filer do not match; Entry by attorney; the name of the Filing User under whose login and password the document is filed must be typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (APR)
April 1, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court HEREBY ORDERS that a TELECONFERENCE SHALL occur on 7/18/2025 at 11:30 AM to discuss the progress of discovery. The call will be off the record and for counsel only. Chambers will circulate dial-in instructions prior to the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 4/1/2025. (APR) cc: COR,CD
April 1, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER: 1. NLT 21 days before the Pretrial Conference, counsel shall file the following: a. a list of witnesses and exhibits in accordance with the Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(3) and the following: (i) - (iii); b. any appropriate motions in limine; c. the transcript of all evidentiary depositions to be used at trial along with any motions for ruling by the court upon any objections made in any evidentiary deposition to be used at trial on which ruling by the court is necessary prior to trial. Any objection within any deposition which is not so raised specifically (by citation to page number and question number) for ruling by the court shall be deemed to be summarily overruled; d. a pretrial memorandum brief containing a succinct statement of the facts of the case, the issues of fact and the issues of law; 2. NLT 14 days before the Pretrial Conference, the parties shall file: a. written objections, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3), to the lists of witnesses and exhibits previously filed by any other party. Objections not so disclosed, other than objections under Rules 402 and 403 of the Federal Rules of Evidence, shall be deemed waived unless excused by the court for good cause shown; b. responses to any other party's motion in limine; and c. responses to any other party's motion for a ruling on any objection made in an evidentiary deposition. 3. At the pretrial conference, counsel for the partes shall be prepared to: a. discuss and make possible stipulations of admissibility, or threshold foundation requirements for admissibility of exhibits, including authenticity; discuss and make stipulations of fact or law which would expedite the trial of this action; b. disclose any demonstrative or summary exhibits intended for use at trial; c. discus the possibility of settlement; and d. advise the Court of anticipated technological issues that may arise at trial. 4. The Pretrial Conference shall be attended by all attorneys who will be trying the case. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/1/2025. (APR) cc: COR
April 1, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. The following deadlines shall be observed in this matter: (a) Counsel for parties shall exchange Rule 26(a)(1) information by 4/15/2025. These need not be filed in the Court record; (b) Counsel for Pl shall have TO AND INCLUDING 8/1/2025 by which to file any motions to join additional parties or amend pleadings. Counsel for Dft shall have TO AND INCLUDING 8/15/2025 by which to file any motions to join additional parties or amend pleadings. (c) Supplementation of disclosures and responses as required by Rule 26(e). Supplemental disclosures and responses need not be filed in the Court record; (d) Rule 26(a)(2) reports from expert trial witnesses are due: (i) From Pl by 7/1/2025; (ii) From Dft by 8/1/2025; (e) All discovery shall be completed by 10/31/2025; and (f) All dispositive and Daubert motions shall be filed NLT 11/1/2025, with response and reply time as per Local Rule 7.1(c)(1) and (2No extensions of time may be granted by the USMJ or by agreement of the parties. Applications for extensions will be granted by the trial judge only upon good cause shown. 2. No motion to compel, nor any other motions relating to a discovery dispute, shall be filed unless all counsel involved in such dispute have first conferred as directed by Fed.R.Civ.P. 37(a)(2)(A). 3. The parties shall observe the following directives regarding the filing of discovery materials in this case unless the court otherwise specifically so orders: (a) - (b). 4. No extensions of the deadlines set in this order, or those contained in the separate pretrial conference order also entered this date shall be granted unless an appropriate motion is filed prior to expiration of the deadline in question, and upon a showing of good cause beyond the control of counsel in the exercise of due diligence. 5. TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 4/23/2026 at 02:00 PM in LEXINGTON before Judge Karen K. Caldwell. A separate Order with call information will be entered prior to the pretrial conference. 6. JURY TRIAL set for 5/11/2026 at 09:00 AM in LONDON. Counsel should be present by 8:30 a.m. The Court will set aside (5 days) for trial. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for purposes of managing all discovery and pretrial scheduling issues, including resolving all discovery disputes and revising any dates and deadlines established in the Court's Scheduling Order, except for the dispositive motion deadline. Discovery disputes to be resolved as outlined in this Order. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 4/1/2025. (APR) cc: COR, LON CD, LON JC, LEX CD. Modified text on 4/1/2025 (APR).
March 19, 2025 Filing 6 JOINT STATUS REPORT of parties planning meeting by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Haara, Laura)
March 19, 2025 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #6 Joint Status Report of parties planning meeting (APR)
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. W/in 21 days from the date of service of this order, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case; to make or arrange for the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1); and to develop a proposed discovery plan. 2. NLT 14 days after the meeting, counsel shall file a written joint report containing: (a) - (h). Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 3/5/2025.(APR)cc: COR
February 24, 2025 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Haara, Laura)
February 24, 2025 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Karen K. Caldwell for review: #4 Answer to Complaint (APR)
February 20, 2025 Filing 2 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Personal Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (APR)
February 20, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Laurel Circuit Court, case number 25-CI-00090 ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-6036863), filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing (State Court Notice), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(APR)
February 20, 2025 Conflict Check run. (APR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hauenstein v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly R. Hauenstein
Represented By: Yancey L. White
Represented By: Alice Annette Morgan-White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura M. Haara
Represented By: Douglas W. Langdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?