Click et al v. Thompson
Plaintiff: Oberdeen Click
Defendant: Randy Thompson
Case Number: 7:2012cv00032
Filed: March 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Pikeville Office
County: Knott
Presiding Judge: Amul R. Thapar
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 OPINION AND ORDER: 1) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (DE 40 ) is GRANTED; 2) Plaintiff's retaliation claim under 42:1983 is DISMISSED with prejudice; and 3) Plaintiff's state-law claim of wrongful discharge is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/2014. (RCB)cc: COR
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the compliant, R. 17 , is GRANTED. Clerk shall DOCKET the first amended complaint tendered by plaintiff, R. 17 -1, as the complaint in this matter. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 3/1/2013. (RCB)cc: COR
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) Dft's Motion to Dismiss, R. 5 , is GRANTED IN PART and Plaintiff's Section 1983 claims based on the 2009 and 2011 incidents are DISMISSED. (2) Dft's Motion to Dismiss, R. 5 , is DENIED IN PART and Plaintiff's Section 1983 claims based on the 2012 incident, as well as his state-law claims based on all three incidents, may proceed. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 10/18/2012. (RCB)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Click et al v. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oberdeen Click
Represented By: Nicholas C.A. Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?