Citizens National Bank of Paintsville v. MCNB Bank and Trust Company

Plaintiff: Citizens National Bank of Paintsville
Defendant: MCNB Bank and Trust Company
Case Number: 7:2012cv00102
Filed: August 29, 2012
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Pikeville Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Karen K. Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2016 130 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: I. MCNB's motion to limit references to facts solely relevant to the issue of the breach of contract (DE 105 ). This motion is DENIED as premature. Court will hear argument as to these two items of evidence at the pretria l conference. II. Citizens' motion in limine regarding various issues (DE 108 ). As set forth below, this motion is GRANTED in part, DENIED in part, and DEFERRED in part until after oral argument is heard at the pretrial conference. See 1-5. III. Citizens' motion to update damages through the trial date (DE 98 ). This motion is GRANTED. Court will hear argument on this issue at the pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 2/17/2016. (RCB)cc: COR
September 30, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: 1) Citizens' motion in limine (DE 56 ) to exclude opinion of dft's expert, Dr. Donald J. Mullineaux, and to prohibit any testimony or evidence that Citizens should have purchased mortgage-backed securities to mitigate d amages is DENIED; and 2) Citizens' motion (DE 72 ) to treat its motion in limine as a motion for summary judgment on MCNB's mitigation-of-damages defense is DENIED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 9/30/2015. (RCB)cc: COR
July 26, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the alternative to Transfer Venue (DE 11 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/26/2013. (RCB)cc: COR

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens National Bank of Paintsville v. MCNB Bank and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens National Bank of Paintsville
Represented By: John Morgan McGarvey
Represented By: John T. McGarvey
Represented By: M. Thurman Senn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCNB Bank and Trust Company
Represented By: Jonathan L. Gay
Represented By: William Scott Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?