Kidd v. SSA
Plaintiff: Marsha F. Kidd
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 7:2016cv00220
Filed: September 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Pikeville Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Danny C. Reeves
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 2. It appears plaintiffs' attorney submitted additional materials captioned "Notice of Filing" in Pikeville Civil Action No. 7: 16-220, 48 , on October 30, 2019. To extent these materials are deemed to request additional relief such as leave to file untimely documents, such relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/31/2019. (RCB)cc: COR
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees under EAJA 46 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/29/2019. (RCB)cc: COR
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: For the reasons discussed in the Courts October 6, 2016, Memorandum Order & Opinion, and those further articulated here and during the hearing held this date, the plafs fail to establish any of the necessary factors for injunctive relief. Accordingly, the plafsmotions for injunctive relief have been denied. [No. 7: 16-178, [Record No. 22]; and No. 7: 16-220, Record No. 23 By operation of the February 23, 2017, Order entered in both actions, these matters are now STAYED pending the Sixth Circuits decision in Perkins or other substantially similar matters. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 2/24/17.(MJY)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kidd v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha F. Kidd
Represented By: Wolodymyr Cybriwsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: John S. Osborn, III(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?