Challoner v. Kizziah

Petitioner: Dale Lloyd Challoner
Respondent: Gregory Kizziah
Case Number: 7:2018cv00078
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Pikeville Office
County: Martin
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Challoner's "motion to alter, amend, or reconsider" R. #6 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 8/30/18. (MJY) cc: COR, Challoner via US Mail.
August 20, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #6 MOTION to Alter, Amend or Reconsider #5 Judgment, by Dale Lloyd Challoner, Pro Se. (MJY)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Alter, Amend or Reconsider #5 Judgment, by Dale Lloyd Challoner, Pro Se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope Postmarked 8-16-18)(MJY)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 JUDGMENT: 1. Dale Lloyd Challoner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus #1 is DENIED. Judgment is entered in favor of Respondent. 2. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from Court's docket. 3. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/19/2018. (RCB)cc: COR, Challoner via U.S. mail
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 1. Challoner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus #1 is DENIED. 2. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from Court's docket. 3. A corresponding Judgment will be entered this date. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 7/19/2018. (RCB)cc: COR, Challoner via U.S. mail
July 16, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (MJY)
July 16, 2018 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers. (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(MJY) cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail
July 16, 2018 Conflict Check run. (MJY)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 7005272.) filed by Dale Lloyd Challoner. (Attachments: #1 Filing Fee Receipt, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope Postmarked 7-13-18) (Note: Returned copy of Petition to Pro se Filer in envelope provided). (MJY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Challoner v. Kizziah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dale Lloyd Challoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gregory Kizziah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?