Gallop v. USA

Petitioner: Rakeem Gallop
Respondent: USA and Warden Gregory Kizziah
Case Number: 7:2018cv00111
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 JUDGMENT: 1. Enters JUDGMENT in favor of Respondent; 2. DENIES Gallop's 2241 filings DE #1 & DE #2 , with respect to all issues raised in this proceeding; and 3. STRIKES this matter from Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/20/2018. (RCB)cc: COR, Gallop via U.S. mail
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1. Clerk SHALL forward a copy of Court's Pro Se Information Packet, DE #6 , this Order, and accompanying Judgment to: Rakeem Gallop, #19601-021, USP Lewisburg. 2. Court SUBSTITUTES Warden Gregory Kizziah for USA as respondent in this proceeding; 3. Court DENIES Gallop's construed petitions-DE #1 (to extent not already denied) and DE #2 -for a 2241 writ of habeas corpus; 4. Court enters Judgment contemporaneously with this Order. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/20/2018. (RCB)cc: COR, Gallop w/Pro Se Information Packet & Judgment via U.S. mail
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Rakeem Gallop re #6 Pro Se Information Packet. (MJY)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers. cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page) (TDA)
October 22, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: Case Transferred In from Southern District of Georgia - no fees paid nor mtn ifp filed. (TDA)
October 22, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #2 MOTION to recorrect judgment due to "plain error." (TDA)
October 22, 2018 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Southern. Case number 4:17-cv-00242. File and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR & Gallop w/ copy of docket sheet
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that the Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer Gallop's case to the Eastern District of Kentucky. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 10/19/18. (loh) [Transferred from gasd on 10/22/2018.]
December 12, 2017 Motions No Longer Referred: #2 MOTION to recorrect judgment due to "plain error." (jlm) [Transferred from gasd on 10/22/2018.]
December 8, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION to recorrect judgment due to "plain error" by Rakeem Gallop. REFERRED to Judge G. R. Smith.(jlm) [Transferred from gasd on 10/22/2018.]
December 8, 2017 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Rakeem Gallop.(jlm) [Transferred from gasd on 10/22/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallop v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: R. Brian Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Gregory Kizziah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rakeem Gallop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?