Graver v. Warfield Volunteer Fire & Rescue, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Paul Graver
Defendant: Jim Ferguson, American Alternative Insurance Corporation, Warfield Volunteer Fire & Rescue, Inc. and Greg Alley
Case Number: 7:2018cv00115
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: (1) action held in ABEYANCE, pursuant to 11:362(a)(3), pending further orders of Court; (2) The bankruptcy trustee, Tom Vaughn, is DIRECTED to file a status report w/in 14 DAYS indicating whether trustee wishes to continue action in this Court or another forum; and (3) Clerk DIRECTED to mail copy of Order to trustee, Tom Vaughn, at address provided at (DE #3 -1). Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 11/15/2018. (TDA) cc: COR & Tom Vaughn via US Mail
November 15, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Caldwell for review: #3 Notice of Bankruptcy (TDA)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Paul Graver of Bankruptcy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Bankruptcy Filing)(Friend, Noah)
November 8, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO NOAH FRIEND re #1 Complaint; attorney notified clerk the summons should be returned electronically; however, a prepared summons was not attached to the electronic filing of the complaint in the fictitious miscellaneous case number 18-99999. A summons may be issued by presenting the prepared summons to the Clerk for issuance on paper or by electronically filing a document entitled Notice of Filing with the prepared summons as an attachment within 7 calendar days. cc: COR (TDA)
November 8, 2018 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4210423), filed by Paul Graver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lease Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graver v. Warfield Volunteer Fire & Rescue, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Alternative Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warfield Volunteer Fire & Rescue, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Graver
Represented By: Noah Robert Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?