Vidal v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ciro M. Vidal
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv00003
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 : parties being in agreement and Court being advised, it is hereby ORDERED that all claims in matter by Pla against Dft shall be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 2/26/2019. (TDA) cc: COR
February 22, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #5 Proposed Agreed Order of Dismissal. (TDA)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation of Dismissal by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Ciro M. Vidal. (Massengale, Roger) Modified text & filer on 2/22/2019 (TDA).
February 22, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #4 Order For Meeting and Report - nothing filed. (TDA)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. NLT 30 days from service, parties shall conduct meeting to discuss possibilities for settlement or resolution of case and develop proposed discovery plan. 2. At meeting, parties shall exchange R 26(a)(1), make suppl required by R 26(e). 3. NLT 10 days after meeting parties shall file joint report containing: (see items a-i). 4. Parties advise Court of parent corporations, subsidiaries, affiliates, members and/or partners associated. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 1/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 AO 85 Consent Form) (TDA) cc: COR
January 8, 2019 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (TDA)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Letcher Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00305. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4255600), filed by Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(TDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vidal v. Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ciro M. Vidal
Represented By: Adam P. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Roger L. Massengale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?