Howard v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Gena Howard
Defendant: George Vince Salyer and Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2019cv00016
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gena Howard (RCB)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gena Howard filed by Gena Howard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Denial Letter, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Reservation of Rights Letter, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Dec. 2018 Letter, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Payment Summary)(Hagerman, Bartley)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gena Howard filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, George Vince Salyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Allstate Policy)(Barfield, Mindy)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1. Parties' Joint Motion for Stay #7 is GRANTED; 2. Parties' obligations under R. #6 are STAYED; 3. In event the Court denies Plf's Motion for Remand, parties SHALL HAVE up to and including thirty days from date of Order to comply with Rule 26(f). Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 3/1/2019. (RCB)cc: COR
February 27, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: re #7 JOINT MOTION to Stay re #5 Order For Meeting and Report by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, George Vince Salyer, Gena Howard (RCB)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT MOTION to Stay re #5 Order For Meeting and Report by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, George Vince Salyer, Gena Howard (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barfield, Mindy) Modified text on 2/27/2019 (RCB).
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gena Howard (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Hagerman, Bartley)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR REPORT OF PARTIES' PLANNING MEETING: 1. NLT 30 days parties shall meet to discuss possibilities for prompt settlement or resolution and to develop a proposed discovery plan. 2. At meeting, parties shall exchange disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). 3. NLT 10 days after meeting, parties file a joint report outlining proposed discovery plan. This report shall conform to FRCP Appendix Form 52, and shall include: a-h; and (i) whether parties consent to jurisdiction of magistrate judge. 4. corporation or partnership associations. Signed by Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove on 2/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(RCB)cc: COR
February 8, 2019 Conflict Check run. (RCB)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (RCB)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, George Vince Salyer. (RCB)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Magoffin Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-15, filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, George Vince Salyer. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4280551) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(RCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Vince Salyer
Represented By: Shadette Page Johnson
Represented By: Mindy G. Barfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Shadette Page Johnson
Represented By: Mindy G. Barfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gena Howard
Represented By: M. Austin Mehr
Represented By: Bartley K. Hagerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?