Adams v. SSA
Plaintiff: Michael Adams
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 7:2019cv00088
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Holland, Laura)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Adams by USM via Certified Mail to Commissioner of SSA served on 10/21/2019. Service to U.S. Attorney executed by USM via Certified Mail on 10/18/19; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed by USM via Certified Mail on 10/24/19. (MJY)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service. (MJY) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2019: #1 Time Stamped copy of summons) (MJY).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Grsanted re #3 - The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. The United States marshal is ordered to serve the summons with a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant(s). The United States will advance the costs of service. Prisoner plaintiffs are responsible for full payment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 10/15/2019. (MJY)cc: COR
October 11, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Karen Caldwell for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Adams. (MJY)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Adams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MJY)
October 11, 2019 Conflict Check run. (MJY)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Michael Adams. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MJY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: Cheryl D. Morgan
Represented By: Laura Hope Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Adams
Represented By: Kelly Lynn Ward Wallen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?