Patrick v. SSA
Plaintiff: Gayetta Patrick
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Case Number: 7:2019cv00094
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Holland, Laura)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commissioner of SSA. (Morgan, Cheryl)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gayetta Patrick via FedEx by USM to Commissioner of SSA served on 10/23/2019. Service to U.S. Attorney executed via FedEx by USM on 10/23/2019; Service to U.S. Attorney General executed via FedEx by USM on 10/23/2019. (RCB)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of SSA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal for service. (RCB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2019: #1 Receipt) (RCB).
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 is GRANTED. The tendered Complaint #1 shall be made a permanent part of record herein, and Plaintiff may proceed without payment of costs or fees. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/16/2019. (RCB)cc: COR
October 15, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Bunning for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gayetta Patrick (RCB)
October 15, 2019 Conflict Check run. (RCB)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gayetta Patrick (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(RCB)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Gayetta Patrick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(RCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Represented By: Cheryl D. Morgan
Represented By: Laura Hope Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayetta Patrick
Represented By: Kelly Lynn Ward Wallen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?