Elkins v. Appalachian State's Analytical, LLC
Plaintiff: Crystal Elkins
Defendant: Appalachian State's Analytical, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00103
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. Court DENIES DE #6 , as moot; and 2. Court DIRECTS Clerk to strike this matter from Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/20/2019. (RCB)cc: COR
November 19, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Robert E. Wier for review: #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (TDA)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Crystal Elkins (Brown, Nathan)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 : Pla shall have to and including WEDNESDAY DECEMBER 4, 2019, to file any response to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 11/14/2019. (TDA) cc: COR
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Appalachian State's Analytical, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OSHA Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certification of Coverage, #3 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Kyle)
November 12, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Atkins for review: #5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. (TDA)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases at case opening. Court refers case to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/12/2019. (TDA) cc: COR
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Appalachian State's Analytical, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Standard Laboratories Inc. for Appalachian State's Analytical, LLC.. (Johnson, Kyle)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Kyle Johnson. #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed by Appalachian State's Analytical, LLC, without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (RCB)
November 5, 2019 Conflict Check run. (RCB)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pike Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-1043, filed by Appalachian State's Analytical, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4513797) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Becky Gainer, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Robert Scott Robbins, #4 Exhibit 4 - USDC - Civil Federal Judicial Caseload Statistics, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(RCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elkins v. Appalachian State's Analytical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appalachian State's Analytical, LLC
Represented By: Kyle Donald Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Elkins
Represented By: Nathan D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?