Combs v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gene Combs
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 7:2020cv00161
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Edward B Atkins
Referring Judge: Robert E Wier
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES: re #6 Dft Hartford shall have up to and including March 7, 2021 to file an Answer or other responsive pleading to Plf's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 1/22/2021. (RCB)cc: COR
January 22, 2021 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Atkins for review: re #6 Proposed Agreed Order Extending Defendant's Time to Answer by Gene Combs. (TDA)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Stipulation Extending Defendant's Time to Answer by Gene Combs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wheeler, Charles) Modified text on 1/22/2021 (TDA).
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance, served on 01/07/2021, filed by Gene Combs. (Wheeler, Charles) Modified text & updated answer due on 1/19/2021 (TDA).
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier. (TDA) cc: COR
December 31, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (TDA)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-4863384), filed by Gene Combs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter from The Hartford, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (TDA)
December 31, 2020 Conflict Check run. (TDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Combs v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Combs
Represented By: Charles Phillip Wheeler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?