Minix v. Dials et al
Plaintiff: Marcus S. Minix, Sr.
Defendant: Timothy Dials, Erin M. Bravo, Thomas W. Watkins, OD, Phyllis A. Oppenheimer, Krista Hubbard, Avesis, Inc., John Does, Guardian Life Insurance Company of America and Avesis Third Party Administrators, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2021cv00069
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGMENT: 1. Marcus S. Minix, Sr.'s complaint #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to the abstention doctrine of Younger v. Harris, 401 U.S. 37 (1971). 2. This action is STRICKEN from Court's docket. 3. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment, and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/13/2021. (RCB)cc: COR and Marcus S. Minix, Sr., by US Mail
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 1. Minix's complaint #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to the abstention doctrine of Younger v. Harris, 401 U.S. 37 (1971). 2. This action is STRICKEN from Court's docket. 3. Court will enter an appropriate Judgment. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/13/2021. (RCB)cc: COR and Marcus S. Minix, Sr., by US Mail
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #8 filed by Marcus S. Minix, Sr., pro se (RCB)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #11 Response to Order to Show Cause (RCB)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erin M. Bravo. (English, Charles)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Dials. (English, Charles)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Attorney Update. Aaron J. Silletto & Heather Lynn Becker added for Timothy Dials, per DE #9. (TDA)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SHOW CAUSE ORDER: 1. Within 21 days from date of this Order, Minix must show cause, in writing, why this action should not be dismissed pursuant to the Younger abstention doctrine. 2. Minix is advised that this action will be dismissed without prejudice if he fails to comply with this Order within the time directed. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 9/21/2021. (RCB)cc: COR and Marcus S. Minix, Sr. by US Mail
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Avesis Third Party Administrators, Inc., Avesis, Inc., Guardian Life Insurance Company of America; Summons issued and returned to counsel via pick-up from Office of Clerk (Lexington). (RCB)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Marcus S. Minix, Sr., pro se (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Provider Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Grand Jury Testimony, #3 Exhibit C - Avesis Letter, #4 Proposed Summons - Avesis, #5 Proposed Summons - Guardian Life, #6 Proposed Summons - Avesis Third Party)(RCB)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (RCB)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Conflict Check run. (RCB)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions. (RCB) cc: COR and Marcus S. Minix, Sr. by US Mail
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(RCB)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Avesis, Inc., Erin M. Bravo, Timothy Dials, Krista Hubbard, Phyllis A. Oppenheimer, Thomas W. Watkins, OD; Summons issued and returned to counsel via pick-up from Office of Clerk. (RCB)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Marcus S. Minix, Sr., pro se. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 5032814) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A - Provider Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Grand Jury Testimony, #4 Proposed Summons - Dials, #5 Proposed Summons - Bravo, #6 Proposed Summons - Watkins, #7 Proposed Summons - Oppenheimer, #8 Proposed Summons - Hubbard, #9 Proposed Summons - Avesis, #10 Receipt #5032814)(RCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minix v. Dials et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus S. Minix, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Dials
Represented By: Aaron J. Silletto
Represented By: Charles Anthony English
Represented By: Heather Lynn Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin M. Bravo
Represented By: Aaron J. Silletto
Represented By: Charles Anthony English
Represented By: Heather Lynn Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas W. Watkins, OD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis A. Oppenheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krista Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avesis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avesis Third Party Administrators, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?