Smith v. USA et al
Plaintiff: George Jack Smith
Defendant: USA, Lt. Melvin, CMC Patrick, Unit Manager Ward and SHU Officer J. Preston
Case Number: 7:2022cv00067
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1. Smith's pending fee-related motion #6 is DENIED as moot. 2. That said, Clerk's Office is directed to send Smith another copy of following blank forms: a. a Court-approved Civil Rights Complaint Form [E.D. Ky. 520 Form]; b. an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs [AO 240 Form]; and c. a Certificate of Inmate Account form [E.D. Ky. 523 Form]. 3. If Smith wishes to start a new civil action with this Court, he may do so by completing and filing that new action in accordance with instructions set forth above. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 7/26/2022. (RCB)cc: CORand George Jack Smith w/forms EDKY 520, AO 240 & EDKY 523 by US Mail
July 25, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate of Inmate Account by George Jack Smith, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope pm not legible)(RCB)
July 25, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by George Jack Smith, pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope pm not legible)(RCB)
July 25, 2022 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by George Jack Smith (RCB)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1. Smith's current complaint #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. 2. Smith's pending fee-related motion #3 is DENIED as moot. 3. This specific action is STRICKEN from Court's docket. 4. Clerk's Office is directed to send Smith following blank forms: a. a Court-approved Civil Rights Complaint Form [E.D. Ky. 520 Form]; b. an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs [AO 240 Form]; and c. a Certificate of Inmate Account form [E.D. Ky. 523 Form]. 5. If Smith wishes to start a new civil action with this Court, he may do so by completing and filing that new action in accordance with instructions set forth above. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 7/15/2022. (RCB)cc: COR and George Jack Smith w/forms EDKY 520, AO 240 & EDKY 523 by US Mail
July 14, 2022 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers. (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (TDA)
July 14, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by George Jack Smith pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (TDA)
July 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to Judge, filed by George Jack Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope Postmarked 7/11/22) (TDA)
July 14, 2022 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by George Jack Smith. (TDA)
July 14, 2022 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
July 14, 2022 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred). (TDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Jack Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Melvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMC Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Manager Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHU Officer J. Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?