Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London v. Morrow et al
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Defendant: Eugene C. Morrow, Horizon Transport, Inc., Klaus Bermel-Schanz, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Scottsdale Indemnity Company and Alfa Mutual Insurance Company
Cross_claimant: Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Cross_defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Alfa Mutual Insurance Company, Eugene C. Morrow and Klaus Bermel-Schanz
Counter_claimant: Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Counter_defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Case Number: 1:2016cv00180
Filed: November 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Bowling Green Office
County: Adair
Presiding Judge: Greg N. Stivers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 8/5/2019. Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony (DN 121 ), Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment (DN 122 , 123 , 124 ), and Plaintiff's Motion for Summary J udgment (DN 125 ) are DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limit (DN 140 ), Defendants' Motions to Exceed Page Limit (DN 139 , 147 ), and Plaintiff's Motion to File Supplemental Materials (DN 149 ) are GRANTED. cc: Counsel(JWM)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/1/2018 granting 118 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery. No later than 11/19/2018, Defendants shall produce to Plaintiff any statements that Bermel-Schanz may have given to Alfa on or about 10/15/2015 regarding the subject accident. cc: Counsel (CDF)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 10/6/2017. The motion of Horizon Transport to quash the subpoena issued byMorrow to Brown & Brown DN 80 , is DENIED. The motion of Bermel-Schanz to quash the subpoena issued by Morrow to Brown & Brown, DN 78 , is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. To the extent the motion advocates quashing the subpoena on relevance grounds, the motion is denied. To the extent the motion advocates quashing the subpoena on privilege grounds, the motion is granted in part. Response to subpoena due by 10/23/2017. cc: Counsel(JWM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London v. Morrow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: Daniel P. Berexa
Represented By: Jason K. Murrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene C. Morrow
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rabinowitz
Represented By: Jay R. Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klaus Bermel-Schanz
Represented By: Stefan Richard Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul Thomas Lawless
Represented By: Ian A. Loos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bass
Represented By: Michael J. LaCourse
Represented By: John William Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Stefan Richard Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bass
Represented By: Michael J. LaCourse
Represented By: John William Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul Thomas Lawless
Represented By: Ian A. Loos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Alfa Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Stefan Richard Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Eugene C. Morrow
Represented By: Jonathan A. Rabinowitz
Represented By: Jay R. Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Klaus Bermel-Schanz
Represented By: Stefan Richard Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Bass
Represented By: Michael J. LaCourse
Represented By: John William Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London
Represented By: Daniel P. Berexa
Represented By: Jason K. Murrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?