Colter v. Bowling Green-Warren County Regional Airport Board et al
Plaintiff: Greg Colter
Defendant: Bowling Green-Warren County Regional Airport Board, City of Bowling Green, Warren County, Kentucky and Rob Barnett
Case Number: 1:2017cv00118
Filed: July 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Bowling Green Office
County: Warren
Presiding Judge: H. Brent Brennenstuhl
Presiding Judge: Joseph H. McKinley
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 6/24/2019. For the reasons set forth, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Alter or Amend a Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59 and Motion to Remand Age Discrimination Claim to State Court (DN 84 ) is DENIED. cc: Counsel (CDF)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 2/6/2018 denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter, Amend, or Vacate Memorandum Opinion and Order entered 11/15/2017 (DN 34 ). cc: Counsel (CDR)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 11/15/2017 re Motions to Dismiss (DNs 21 , 22 , 23 , 24 ). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions of Defendants Warren County and Robert Barnett are GRANTED and the motions of Defendants City of Bowling Green and Bowling Green-Warren County Regional Airport Board are GRANTED on counts IV and V and DENIED on counts I, II, and III. cc: Counsel (CDR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colter v. Bowling Green-Warren County Regional Airport Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Colter
Represented By: David F. Broderick
Represented By: Katlin E. Payton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowling Green-Warren County Regional Airport Board
Represented By: Tonya J. Austin
Represented By: Mekesha H. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bowling Green
Represented By: Ena V. Demir
Represented By: H. Eugene Harmon
Represented By: Thomas N. Kerrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren County, Kentucky
Represented By: Aaron D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Barnett
Represented By: Tonya J. Austin
Represented By: Mekesha H. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?