Berkley Assurance Company v. Carter Douglas Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Berkley Assurance Company
Defendant: Carter Douglas Company, LLC and Stephen Bradley Hatcher
Case Number: 1:2018cv00099
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Bowling Green Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Stephen Bradley Hatcher. (Smith, Aaron)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing by Berkley Assurance Company re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Painter, Paul)
August 7, 2018 Remark-Attested copy emailed to Attorney Painter per request 8/7/2018. (JWM)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Carter Douglas Company, LLC, Stephen Bradley Hatcher. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Carter Douglas Company, LLC and Stephen Bradley Hatcher filed by Berkley Assurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2690696. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Independent Contractor Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2-Interlocutory Opinion and Order, #3 Exhibit 3-Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4-Answer and Counterclaim, #5 Summons) (JWM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2018: #6 Cover Sheet) (CDF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkley Assurance Company v. Carter Douglas Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkley Assurance Company
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Represented By: Paul J. Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter Douglas Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Bradley Hatcher
Represented By: Aaron D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?