Epperson v. Hart
Plaintiff: Roger Epperson
Defendant: DeEdra Hart
Case Number: 1:2018cv00100
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Bowling Green Office
County: Lyon
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254dp
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 9/20/2018. The Court hereby adopts for the pre-filing stage of the habeas petition that Roger Epperson's attorney submitted attached to the motion to adopt the proposed budget.cc:counsel; Brian Pomerantz (JWM) Modified to edit distribution on 9/20/2018 (JWM).
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 9/18/2018 granting #12 Motion to Stay. Epperson shall file his state court action within 30 days. A status report on the progress of the state court proceedings shall be filed every 90 days, and inform this Court within 14 days of final state court ruling. cc: Counsel; Brian Pomertanz(JWM) Modified to edit distribution on 9/19/2018 (JWM).
September 12, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #11 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus unopposed motion to stay and abey federal habeas proceedings while Epperson returns to state court by Petitioner Roger Epperson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting motion to hold federal habeas proceedings in abeyance while Epperson returns to state court) (Barron, David)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 EX PARTE MOTION by Petitioner Roger Epperson (Attachments: #1 Barron declaration, #2 Pomerantz declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Barron, David)
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Capital Case) By a Person in State Custody and Consolidated Memorandum of Law, filed by Roger Epperson. (See Notice of Filing at DN #9 .) (CDF)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing of Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus (Habeas Petition attached to notice) by Roger Epperson (Attachments: #1 Epperson's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus) (Barron, David)
September 4, 2018 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number L33056713 re DN #6 by Roger Epperson. (JSS)
August 30, 2018 Remark - #6 re-sent to Epperson at the full address for the Kentucky State Penitentiary. (RLK)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason B. Moore on behalf of DeEdra Hart (Moore, Jason)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Roger Epperson. Envelope states Return to Sender, Insufficient Address, and Unable to Forward. (MEJ)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 8/9/2018 denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and granting #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel Appointed Brian M. Pomerantz for Roger Epperson. Counsel shall consult with Robert J. Ranz, Sixth Circuit CJA Budgeting Attorney, and formulate a proposed budget for reasonable compensation, costs and expenses anticipated to be incurred in the case. A proposed budget for the preliminary phase of the case shall be filed ex parte with the court for approval within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order. A complete proposed budget shall be filed ex parte with the court for approval within thirty (30) days of the filing of the habeas corpus petition. Parties shall comply as set forth in Order. cc: Counsel, Petitioner Roger Epperson, David M. Barron, Brian M. Pomerantz, Jason B. Moore, Robert J. Ranz (MEJ)
August 1, 2018 Filing 5 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. Magistrate Judge designation: Judge Regina S. Edwards. (KD)
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Roger Epperson. Responses due by 8/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (KD)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Roger Epperson. (KD)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Roger Epperson. Responses due by 8/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (KD)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Intent to file Habeas Corpus Petition filed by Roger Epperson. (KD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epperson v. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeEdra Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Epperson
Represented By: David M. Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?