Security Seed and Chemical, Inc. v. Duvall et al
Plaintiff: Security Seed and Chemical, Inc.
Defendant: Nathan Wayne Duvall, Jamie Long Duvall, Brandi Martin Duvall and Joshua Lee Duvall
Case Number: 1:2018cv00123
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 10/18/2018. Upon request of counsel; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Telephone Conference set for 10/29/2018 is RESCHEDULED for 10/30/2018 at 10:30 AM CDT before Judge Greg N. Stivers. The Court will initiate the call. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record (TJD)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 10/17/2018. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED a Telephone Conference is set for 10/29/2018 at 10:30 AM CDT before Judge Greg N. Stivers. The Court will initiate the call. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel of Record (TJD)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Brandi Martin Duvall, Jamie Long Duvall, Joshua Lee Duvall, Nathan Wayne Duvall. (Flener, Mark)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Security Seed and Chemical, Inc.. Nathan Wayne Duvall served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (Adams, James)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Security Seed and Chemical, Inc.. Jamie Long Duvall served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (Adams, James)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Security Seed and Chemical, Inc.. Joshua Lee Duvall served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Adams, James)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Security Seed and Chemical, Inc.. Brandi Martin Duvall served on 9/25/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Adams, James)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Security Seed and Chemical, Inc.. (Adams, James)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Brandi Martin Duvall, Jamie Long Duvall, Joshua Lee Duvall, Nathan Wayne Duvall. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/31/2018) (JWM).
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nathan Wayne Duvall, Jamie Long Duvall, Brandi Martin Duvall, and Joshua Lee Duvall, filed by Security Seed and Chemical, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2708113. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-Note and Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2-Loan Commitment, #4 Exhibit 3-Financing Statements, #5 Exhibit 4-Financing Statements, #6 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Security Seed and Chemical, Inc. v. Duvall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Wayne Duvall
Represented By: Mark H. Flener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Long Duvall
Represented By: Mark H. Flener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi Martin Duvall
Represented By: Mark H. Flener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Lee Duvall
Represented By: Mark H. Flener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Security Seed and Chemical, Inc.
Represented By: James G. Adams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?