Collins v. Gilliam et al
Plaintiff: Reba Collins
Defendant: Gilliam Transport, LLC, Jomi, LLC and Charles D. Gilliam
Case Number: 1:2018cv00147
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Reba Collins. (Hartsock, Richard)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl: Scheduling Conference held on 11/27/2018. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 12/3/2018. Plaintiff Joinder of Parties and Amended Pleadings due by 1/4/2019. Defendants Joinder of Parties and Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2019. Pretrial Fact Discovery due by 8/16/2019. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 4/19/2019. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 6/14/2019. Expert Discovery depositions due by 8/16/2019. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/23/2019 at 9:30 AM CT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Dispositive Motions and Daubert Motions due by 9/13/2019. (Review Order in full for specifics, including discovery guidelines.) cc: Counsel (CDF)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Charles D. Gilliam, Gilliam Transport, LLC, Jomi, LLC. (O'Bryan, Patrick)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (EBOC) by Judge Greg N. Stivers on 10/16/18: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 11/6/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/20/2018. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2018 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. cc: Counsel, KL (DJT)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 10/16/2018; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel; KLL (TJD)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL re #1 Notice of Removal from Logan Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 18-CI-00323. cc: Counsel; Logan Circuit Court (JWM) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/15/2018) (JWM).
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Charles D. Gilliam, Gilliam Transport, LLC, Jomi, LLC. (JWM)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Charles D. Gilliam, Gilliam Transport, Jomi, LLC, LLC, from Logan Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00323. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2733810 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Answer, #3 Exhibit 3-State Court File, #4 Exhibit 4-Pre Suit Demand, #5 Exhibit 5-State Court Notice of Filing, #6 Cover Sheet) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Gilliam et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilliam Transport, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Shane O'Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jomi, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Shane O'Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Gilliam
Represented By: Patrick Shane O'Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reba Collins
Represented By: Richard W. Hartsock
Represented By: Mariana Torres Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?