Beaty v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: William Michael Beaty
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00047
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 5/30/2019. (CDF)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Issued Summonses mailed to Plaintiff for service.) (CDF)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 5/8/2019 denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Plaintiff paid the applicable filing fee in full following the 5/8/2019 ex parte hearing.) The Court notes that Plaintiff submitted only two completed summonses with his complaint (DN #1 ). The Clerk of Court shall prepare a summons addressed to the United States Attorney for the Western District of Kentucky and then issue all three summonses. The Clerk of Court shall then mail the three summonses to Plaintiff who will be responsible for serving the summonses with copies of the complaint. cc: Plaintiff, pro se (with issued Summonses and copy of filed Complaint); Counsel (CDF)
May 8, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B33002052 by William Michael Beaty. (JWM)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 4/24/2019, re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2019 at 9:30 AM CT in Bowling Green before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. cc: William Michael Beaty, pro se (CDF)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William Michael Beaty, pro se. (JWM)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. (JWM)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by William Michael Beaty, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaty v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: L. Jay Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Michael Beaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?