Perez v. Barrier Compliance Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Jesus Perez
Defendant: Barrier Compliance Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00061
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Barrier Compliance Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Tonda Edwards Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Kyle)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AGREED ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 6/7/2019 re #4 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation. Defendant shall have until 7/5/2019, in which to answer or respond to Complaint.cc:counsel (JWM)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #1 by Barrier Compliance Services, LLC. (Johnson, Kyle)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Barrier Compliance Services, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTIVE ACTION against Barrier Compliance Services, LLC, filed by Jesus Perez on Behalf of Himself and All Other Similarly Situated. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2869147. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-Employee Handbook, #3 Exhibit 2-12/5/18 Email, #4 Exhibit 3-Reprimand, #5 Exhibit 4-Travel Itinerary, #6 Exhibit 5-Consent, #7 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Barrier Compliance Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrier Compliance Services, LLC
Represented By: Kyle D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Perez
Represented By: Randall S. Strause
Represented By: Courtney L. Graham
Represented By: Parker M. Wornall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?