Graves v. Miller et al

Plaintiff: Bobby C. Graves
Defendant: Christopher W. Miller, Uber USA, LLC and Uber Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00071
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441mv
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl for telephonic scheduling conference held 7/16/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 6/30/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 9/3/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 9/3/2019. Fact Discovery due by 4/1/2020. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 2/3/2020. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 3/16/2020. Expert Discovery due by 4/2/2020. A telephonic status conference will be held 4/2/2020 at 10:00 am CDT. The Court will initiate the call. Daubert Motion due by 5/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2020. cc:counsel (JWM)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Christopher W. Miller. (Moore, Bradly)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Uber USA, LLC. (Gray, Lindsay)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING by Uber USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleading-Stipulation) (Gray, Lindsay)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 6/3/2019. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl will conduct a telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 7/16/2019 at 9:30 am CDT. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel for the parties shall conduct a meeting of the parties by 6/25/2019. Counsel for the parties shall file Rule 26(f) written joint report by 7/9/2019. See Order for specifics. cc:counsel;KL-Case Manager (JWM)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 06/03/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Uber USA, LLC (Gray, Lindsay)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL re #1 Notice of Removal from Warren Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-117. cc: Counsel, Warren Circuit Court (JWM)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Christopher W. Miller. (JWM)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
May 30, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by Uber USA, LLC. (See DN #1 to view PDF) (JWM)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Christopher W. Miller from Warren Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-117, filed by Christopher W. Miller. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2874636 ) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Circuit Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Demand Letter) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graves v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher W. Miller
Represented By: Bradly E. Moore
Represented By: Diane R. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber USA, LLC
Represented By: Lindsay M. Gray
Represented By: James M. Burd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsay M. Gray
Represented By: James M. Burd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby C. Graves
Represented By: Taryn K. Lester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?