Pommier v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Luke Pommier
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00081
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Klapheke, David)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 08/08/2019: The Court having been advised that settlement has been reached on all matters in this case IT IS ORDERED this case is Dismissed without prejudice and stricken from the active docket. The parties shall tender an agreed order dismissing this case with prejudice within forty-five (45) days of entry of this Order. The Court will entertain a motion to redocket this action upon application to this Court within forty-five (45) days from entry of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record (TJD)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/7/2019. The parties having advised they have reached an amicable resolution in this case; IT IS ORDERED the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2019 is REMANDED from the Court's docket. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, Traci Duff (KLL)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Klapheke, David)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 6/26/2019. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl will conduct a telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 8/9/2019 at 10:00 am CDT. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel who will try the case shall participate. Counsel for the parties shall conduct a meeting of the parties by 7/19/2019. Counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report by 8/2/2019. See Order for specifics. cc:counsel;KL-Case Manager (JWM)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 06/25/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL re #1 Notice of Removal from Allen Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-00158. cc: Counsel; Allen Circuit Court (JWM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (JWM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (JWM) Modified to edit text on 6/24/2019 (JWM).
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company from Allen Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00158. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2891166). (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court Record) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pommier v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Pommier
Represented By: Gary S. Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?