Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jeffery E. Smith
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00082
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. This case is reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Lanny King for all purposes, including trial and final entry of judgment.cc:counsel; MB-Case Manager (JWM)
August 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lanny King no longer assigned to case. (JWM)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge (JWM)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers pursuant to General Order No. 2018-02(cc: counsel, Chief Judge Stivers-Case Manager) (MHB)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Notice from USMS of SUMMONSES Returned Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/5/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. Commissioner of Social Security served 7/8/2019. Attorney General served 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 SSA, #2 AG) (JWM)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 7/17/2019. (JWM)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Complaint, Order, and Summonses forwarded to USMS for service. (Attachments: #1 USM 285) (JWM)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 6/26/2019 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is ordered to file Plaintiff's complaint and issue summons. The United States Marshal is ordered to serve the summons with a copy of the complaint and this order on the Defendants. The United States Marshal shall advance the cost of service. cc: Counsel(JWM)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lanny King. (JWM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeffery E. Smith (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (JWM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Jeffery E. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 USM 285) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: L. Jay Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery E. Smith
Represented By: Charles Richard Burchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?