United States of America v. Boll et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Betty P. Boll and Unknown Spouse of Betty P. Boll
Not Yet Classified: Warning Order Attorney
Case Number: 1:2019cv00138
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 MOTION for Warning Order Attorney Fee and Discharge from Further Responsibility (SEE DN #11 to view PDF document.) by Warning Order Attorney. (CDF)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING re #11 Warning Order Attorney Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Billing Statement) by Warning Order Attorney. (Penn, D.) Modified event text and added link on 11/27/2019 (CDF).
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY REPORT and MOTION for Warning Order Attorney Fee and Discharge (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Fee, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Award of Fee and Discharge from Further Responsibility) by Warning Order Attorney. (Penn, D.) Modified to add text on 11/27/2019 (CDF).
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Betty P. Boll served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (Dixon, Melissa)
October 9, 2019 NOTICE of email confirmation as to Melissa Dixson re #5 Request for Fee Refund (MLG)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY FOR THE DEFENDANT, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BETTY P. BOLL Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 10/7/2019 granting #6 Warning Order. Attorney D. Gaines Penn for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel; Defendant(s) (CDF)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Betty P. Boll. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 10/03/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Attorney, Melissa R. Dixon, #2 Proposed Order) (Dixon, Melissa)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION Request for Fee Refund by Plaintiff United States of America (Dixon, Melissa) Modified on 10/8/2019-Motion terminated. Filed incorrectly (MLG).
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Tendered Summons by United States of America re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Dixon, Melissa)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. See Notice for instructions. (JWM)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against Betty P. Boll, Unknown Spouse of Betty P. Boll, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B-Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit C-Mortgage, #5 Exhibit D-Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #6 Exhibit E-Affidavit of Kimberly Williamson, #7 Exhibit F-Affidavit of Kimberly Williamson, #8 Exhibit G-Field Inspection) (JWM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2019: #9 Summons) (JWM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Boll et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty P. Boll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse of Betty P. Boll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Melissa R. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Warning Order Attorney
Represented By: D. Gaines Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?