Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al.
Plaintiff: The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc. and Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Beverly Sackler, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., John Stewart, Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Kathe Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Henry Schein, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., Miami-Luken, Inc., Actavis LLC, Mark Timney, Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Tessa F. Rios, Allergan PLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Walgreen Co., Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Craig Landau, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Jonathan Sackler, H.D. Smith, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Amy K. Thompson, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Russell Gasdia, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Specgx LLC, Richie Pharmacal Co., David Sackler, Depomed, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Anda, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00148
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: J Ronnie Greer
2 Judge: Joseph H McKinley
3 Judge: Greg N Stivers
4 Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Remark: Case transferred from Kentucky Western has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:20-op-45060. (KJA)
February 7, 2020 Case electronically transferred to Ohio Northern. (JM)
February 7, 2020 Filing 99 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Ohio Northern re MDL No.: 2804 (JM)
January 31, 2020 Filing 98 DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE FOR SERVICE IN ANOTHER DISTRICT WITHIN HIS CIRCUIT by Chief Circuit Judge R. Guy Cole, Jr. on 1/30/2020. CASE REASSIGNED to Judge J. Ronnie Greer for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers no longer assigned to case. cc: Counsel; Judges Stivers & Greer; TD; KL (CDF)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 1/22/2020; This matter is referred to Chief Circuit Judge R. Guy Cole, Jr. for reassignment to a District Judge outside the Western District of Kentucky. cc: Counsel; Chief Judge R. Guy Cole, Jr. (via e-mail); Deborah Hunt, Clerk (via e-mail); Julie Cobble, Chief Deputy Clerk (via e-mail) (CDF)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNMENT by Judge David J. Hale on 1/16/2020; IT IS ORDERED that Judge David J. Hale RECUSES from this matter and this action is REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers for reassignment to another Judge. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel, CM-Judge Stivers (NWT)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is reassigned to the docket of the Judge David J. Hale for final disposition. All future pleadings shall be filed under Civil Action Number 1:19CV-00148-DJH. cc: Counsel (CDF)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. transferring case to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers for reassignment to another Judge. cc: Counsel; TD (CDF)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNMENT by Judge Justin R. Walker on 1/10/2020. Judge Justin R. Walker RECUSES from this matter and the action is REASSIGNED to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. for all further proceedings. Counsel shall change the case number to reflect the initials JHM for all future filings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (MEJ)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/11/2019 granting #90 Proposed Agreed Order. IT IS ORDERED that defendant Richie Pharmacal Co. shall have 30 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to remand in which to serve an answer or otherwise defend. cc: Counsel (CDF)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/11/2019 granting #89 Proposed Agreed Order. IT IS ORDERED that defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., and Anda, Inc. shall have 30 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to remand in which to serve an answer or otherwise defend. cc: Counsel (CDF)
December 6, 2019 Filing 90 Proposed Agreed Order by Richie Pharmacal Co. by Richie Pharmacal Co.. (Cook, Matthew)
December 6, 2019 Filing 89 Proposed Agreed Order by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Anda, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Anda, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Luxton, Steven)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/5/2019 granting #80 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant Depomed, Inc. n/k/a Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. shall have 30 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to remand in which to serve an answer or otherwise defend. cc: Counsel (CDF)
December 5, 2019 Filing 87 Proposed Agreed Order by Mallinckrodt, LLC by Mallinckrodt, LLC. (Humphreys, Gene)
December 5, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Gene Lynn Humphreys on behalf of Mallinckrodt, LLC, Specgx LLC (Humphreys, Gene)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/4/2019 granting #83 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant Henry Schein, Inc. shall have until 30 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to remand in which to serve an answer or otherwise defend. cc: Counsel (CDF)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/2/2019 granting #82 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendants Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Co., Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walmart Inc., and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP shall have until 30 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to remand in which to serve an answer or otherwise defend. cc: Counsel (CDF)
December 2, 2019 Filing 83 Proposed Agreed Order by Henry Schein, Inc. by Henry Schein, Inc.. (Thacker, Christopher)
November 27, 2019 Filing 82 Proposed Agreed Order for Pharmacy Defendants to File an Answer by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.. (Gray, Elisabeth)
November 25, 2019 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Non-Exhaustive List of Federal Question Removed Actions Transferred to the Opiate MDL with Pending Motions to Remand, #2 Exhibit 2 - Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., et al. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., et al. Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - County of Jim Wells v. Purdue Pharma L.P. Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - The Board of County Commissioners of Seminole County, State of Oklahoma v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. Memorandum and Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Non-Exhaustive List of Removed Actions Transferred to the Opiate MDL with Pending Motions to Remand Where a Motion to Stay was Filed, #6 Exhibit 6 - County of Alameda, California, et al. v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. Order Staying Actions Pending JPML ACtion, #7 Exhibit 7 - County of Jim Hogg v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. Order) (Stopher, Robert)
November 25, 2019 Filing 80 Proposed Agreed Order by Depomed, Inc. by Depomed, Inc.. (Sadler, Kevin)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #66 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant H. D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company shall have until 30 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to remand in which to serve an answer or otherwise defend. cc: Counsel (CDF)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #64 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant Richie Pharmacal Co. shall have up to and including 12/6/2019, in which to file an answer or otherwise plead. cc: Counsel (CDF)
November 25, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Second Amended Bankruptcy Court Order Extending Injunction Against Continuation of these Proceedings Against Related Parties by Tessa F. Rios, Amy K. Thompson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Preliminary Injunction Order) (Lowe, Robert)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan W. Cuneo. cc: Counsel (CDF)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher J. Lovrien. cc: Counsel (CDF)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah G. Conway. cc: Counsel (CDF)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Steven A. Martino. cc: Counsel (CDF)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Conor Brendan O'Croinin. cc: Counsel (CDF)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David McMullan, Jr. cc: Counsel (CDF)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah Sterling Starns. cc: Counsel (CDF)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ADMITTING PRO HAC VICE (KEVIN M. SADLER) Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (CDF)
November 21, 2019 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc.. (Wicker, Kent)
November 20, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G. Arnzen on behalf of Walgreen Co., Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Arnzen, Mark)
November 19, 2019 Filing 66 Proposed Agreed Order by H.D. Smith, LLC by H.D. Smith, LLC. (Simpson, W.)
November 13, 2019 Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Question Removed Cases Transferred to MDL, #2 Exhibit B - Noble County Orders, #3 Exhibit C - Hogg Order, #4 Exhibit D - Seminole Order, #5 Exhibit E - Jim Wells Order, #6 Exhibit F - Jenks Order, #7 Exhibit G - Consent to Remand, #8 Exhibit H - Cardinal Order) (Sparks, Andrew)
November 13, 2019 Filing 64 Proposed Agreed Order re Answer Deadline by Richie Pharmacal Co. by Richie Pharmacal Co.. (Cook, Matthew)
November 13, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Porter Cook on behalf of Richie Pharmacal Co. (Cook, Matthew)
November 13, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Kerrick on behalf of Richie Pharmacal Co. (Kerrick, Thomas)
November 13, 2019 Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for H.D. Smith, LLC. by H.D. Smith, LLC. (Simpson, W.)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/13/2019 granting #41 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendants, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. and Anda, Inc. shall have up to and including 12/6/2019 in which to file their answers or otherwise plead. cc: Counsel (CDF)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/13/2019 granting #35 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant Depomed, Inc. (n/k/a Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.) shall have up to and including 12/6/2019 in which to file its answer or otherwise plead. cc: Counsel (CDF)
November 12, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearances of Certain Attorneys for Plaintiffs by ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc. (Klein, Mathew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Kennedy Simpson and Joseph A. Wright on behalf of H.D. Smith, LLC (Simpson, W.) Modified to add attorney on 11/13/2019 (CDF).
November 11, 2019 Response to #15 Notice of Deficiency as to Jonathan W. Cuneo filed by Plaintiffs. (See DN #56 .) (CDF)
November 11, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Jonathan W. Cuneo to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2981457. by Plaintiffs ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc. (Wicker, Kent)
November 11, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE to re #42 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2/16/18 - MDL Order Regarding Remands, #2 Exhibit 2 - 7/24/19 MDL Order on Remand, #3 Exhibit 3 - 7/25/18 Remand Order Spartanburg Co., #4 Exhibit 4 - 5/21/18 Remand Order Greenville Co., #5 Exhibit 5 - 3/8/18 Remand Order Dallas Co., #6 Exhibit 6 - 2/1/18 Order Denying Motion to Stay Brooke Co. Comm., #7 Exhibit 7 - 11/21/18 Order Denying Motion to Stay City of Worcester, #8 Exhibit 8 - 7/31/18 Order Denying Motion to Stay Weber Co. Utah, #9 Exhibit 9 - 7/31/18 Order Denying Motion to Stay Unitah Co. Utah, #10 Exhibit 10 - 6/18/19 Remand Order El Monte v. Purdue, #11 Exhibit 11 - 4/16/18 Remand Order County of Van Zandt, #12 Exhibit 12 - 10/9/18 Remand Order County of Lexington, #13 Exhibit 13 - 12/13/17 Transcript of Teleconference Proceedings Regarding Remands) (Wicker, Kent)
November 8, 2019 Responses to #8 Notice of Deficiency as to Christopher J. Lovrien, #26 Notice of Deficiency as to Sarah G. Conway, filed by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (See DN #52 & DN #53 ). (CDF)
November 8, 2019 Filing 54 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Wendy W. Feinstein re #42 Motion to Stay.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/26/2019. (KJA)
November 8, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for Christopher J. Lovrien to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2980545. by Defendants Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Sparks, Andrew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Sarah G. Conway to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2980512. by Defendants Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Sparks, Andrew)
November 7, 2019 Response to #28 Notice of Deficiency: Motion for PHV has been filed by Attorney Steven Martino. (*NO PDF ATTACHED.). (JM)
November 7, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Attorney Steven A. Martino to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 125. Receipt #P33004036; filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (JM)
November 7, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2979253. by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Stopher, Robert)
November 6, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for David McMullan, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2978244. by Plaintiffs ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Barrett, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (CDF). (Main Document 49 replaced on 11/7/2019) (CDF).
November 6, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Sarah Sterling Starns to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2978231. by Plaintiffs ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Barrett, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (CDF). (Main Document 48 replaced on 11/7/2019) (CDF).
November 6, 2019 Filing 47 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Mark Arnzen re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/25/2019. (KJA)
November 5, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Depomed, Inc. re #45 MOTION for Kevin M. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (CDF)
November 1, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Kevin M. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Defendant Depomed, Inc. (Filing fee $125; Receipt #015170). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (CDF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (CDF).
November 1, 2019 Filing 44 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE pursuant to GO 2019-10. Case reassigned to Judge Justin R. Walker for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. no longer assigned to case. cc: Counsel (CDF)
October 31, 2019 Filing 43 Mail sent to Steve Martino (DN 5 ) Returned as Undeliverable - Refused. (Re-mailed on 11/1/2019 to correct address.) (CDF)
October 31, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, #2 Exhibit 1 - Takoma Regional Hospital Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - County of Alameda, CA Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Conditional Transfer Order, #5 Exhibit 4 - LAC Courte Order, #6 Exhibit 5 - Robinson Ranchera Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - Commonwealth of KY Order, #8 Exhibit 7 - City of Alexandria Order, #9 Exhibit 8 - City of Galax Order, #10 Exhibit 9 - City of Portland Order, #11 Exhibit 10 - City of Mateo Order, #12 Exhibit 11 - Village of Melrose Park Order, #13 Exhibit 12 - City of Jacksonville Order, #14 Exhibit 13 - Delaware County Order, #15 Exhibit 14 - Osage County Order, #16 Exhibit 15 - Pawnee County Order, #17 Exhibit 16 - International Union of Operating Engineers Notification of Docket Entry, #18 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stay) (Stopher, Robert)
October 31, 2019 Filing 41 Proposed Agreed Order by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Actavis LLC, Anda, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Actavis LLC, Anda, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc.. (Luxton, Steven)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 10/29/2019 granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John W. ("Don") Barrett. cc: Counsel (CDF)
October 29, 2019 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreens Eastern Co., Inc. and Walgreen Co., Inc., by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreen Co., Inc. (Tremper, Frank) Modified to add additional filers and proper corporate parent relationships on 10/30/2019 (CDF).
October 29, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank K. Tremper on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreen Co., Inc. (Tremper, Frank) Modified to add additional filers on 10/30/2019 (CDF).
October 28, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for John W. "Don" Barrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2972025. by Plaintiffs ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc. (Klein, Mathew)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AGREED ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 10/28/2019; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the defendants, CVS, Rite Aid, Walgreens, and Walmart shall have up to and including 12/6/2019 in which to file their answers or otherwise plead, re #1 Notice of Removal, re #34 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation. cc: Counsel (CDF)
October 25, 2019 Filing 35 Proposed Agreed Order by Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc. by Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc.. (Klein, Mathew)
October 24, 2019 Filing 34 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Walgreen Co., Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Stopher, Robert)
October 24, 2019 Filing 33 Proposed Order of Remand to State Court re #7 MOTION to Remand by ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc.. (Klein, Mathew)
October 24, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.. by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.. (Gray, Elisabeth)
October 24, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth S. Gray and Mark Fenzel on behalf of Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. (Gray, Elisabeth) Modified to add attorney Fenzel on 10/24/2019 (CDF).
October 23, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Warren Burns re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Indiana, L.L.C.. by CVS Indiana, L.L.C.. (Stopher, Robert)
October 23, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Steve Martino re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Sterling Starns re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 26 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Sarah G. Conway re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Stopher, Robert)
October 23, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Rick Yelton re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Richard Barrett re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation. (Stopher, Robert)
October 23, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Estes Stopher and Robert D. Bobrow on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Stopher, Robert) Modified to add attorney Bobrow on 10/24/2019 (CDF).
October 23, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Monica Miller re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Mark H. Dubester re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Lydia A. Wright re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Korey A. Nelson re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Joseph M. Kramer re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Jonathan W. Cuneo re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to John W. Barrett re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Jennifer E. Kelly re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr. re #1 Notice of Removal,. Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Evelyn Li re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to David L. Black re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to David McMullan, Jr. re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Christopher Lovrien re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 EMERGENCY MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Klein, Mathew) Modified to add text on 10/24/2019 (CDF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (CDF).
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 10/23/2019: This action is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for determination of nondispositive matters, pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate Judge is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. IT IS SO ORDERED. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel, K. Lovell (EAS)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 10/21/2019. Pursuant to 28 USC 455, the Court concludes that recusal in this case is required. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is reassigned to the docket of Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. for all further proceedings and disposition, pursuant to General Order 2019-07. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; EAS
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL re #1 Notice of Removal from Warren Circuit Court, Civil Action No. 19-CI-01146. cc: Counsel; Christopher Lovrien; David McMullan, Jr., David L. Black; Eveyln Li; Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.; Jennifer E. Kelly; John W. Barrett; Jonathan W. Cuneo; Joseph M. Kramer; Korey A. Nelson; Lydia A. Wright; Monica Miller; Richard Barrett; Rick Yelton; Sarah G. Conway; Sterling Starns; Steve Martino; Warren Burns (JWM)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (JWM)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. from Warren Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-01146. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2964858 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C-State Court Record, #4 Cover Sheet) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Kent Wicker
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Lydia A. Wright
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: Sarah S. Starns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Kent Wicker
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Lydia A. Wright
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: Sarah S. Starns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Kent Wicker
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Lydia A. Wright
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: Sarah S. Starns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Kent Wicker
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Lydia A. Wright
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: Sarah S. Starns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pikeville Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Kent Wicker
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Lydia A. Wright
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: Sarah S. Starns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Kent Wicker
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Lydia A. Wright
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: Sarah S. Starns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Kent Wicker
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Lydia A. Wright
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: Sarah S. Starns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Claire Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Kent Wicker
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Lydia A. Wright
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: Sarah S. Starns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Kent Wicker
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Lydia A. Wright
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: Sarah S. Starns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Kent Wicker
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Lydia A. Wright
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: Sarah S. Starns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Healthcare System, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Kent Wicker
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Lydia A. Wright
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: Sarah S. Starns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Kent Wicker
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Steve Martino
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Lydia A. Wright
Represented By: Warren Burns
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Richard Barrett
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: Sarah S. Starns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Represented By: Gene Lynn Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kirk Ogrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James K. O'Connor
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan T. Polczynski
Represented By: Steve Brody
Represented By: Charles Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: James K. O'Connor
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Represented By: Andrew L. Sparks
Represented By: Sarah G. Conway
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Timney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tessa F. Rios
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew L. Sparks
Represented By: Sarah G. Conway
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Perry M. Bentley
Represented By: Monica Hobson Braun
Represented By: Steven B. Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, L.L.C.
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Frank K. Tremper
Represented By: Mark G. Arnzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co., Inc.
Represented By: Frank K. Tremper
Represented By: Mark G. Arnzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Represented By: Joseph A. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan T. Polczynski
Represented By: Steve Brody
Represented By: Charles Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By: Frank K. Tremper
Represented By: Mark G. Arnzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy K. Thompson
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Neil A. Hlawatsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Gasdia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kirk Ogrosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan T. Polczynski
Represented By: Steve Brody
Represented By: Charles Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Represented By: Gene Lynn Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richie Pharmacal Co.
Represented By: Thomas N. Kerrick
Represented By: Matthew Porter Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depomed, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan T. Polczynski
Represented By: Steve Brody
Represented By: Charles Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?