United States of America v. Cherry et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Tony Cherry, Kimberly D. Cherry and The Medical Center at Scottsville
Case Number: 1:2019cv00173
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Tony Cherry served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Campbell, William)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. (Campbell, William)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Kimberly D. Cherry served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Campbell, William)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. (Campbell, William)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. The Medical Center at Scottsville served on 12/9/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Campbell, William)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Medical Center at Scottsville. (Adams, Charles)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 11/27/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Kimberly D. Cherry, Tony Cherry, The Medical Center at Scottsville. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against Kimberly D. Cherry, Tony Cherry, The Medical Center at Scottsville, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B-Real Estate Mortgage for Kentucky, #4 Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #5 Exhibit D-Notice of Judgment Lien, #6 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cherry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly D. Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Medical Center at Scottsville
Represented By: Charles W. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William F. Campbell
Represented By: Katherine A. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?