United States of America v. Shelton et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC, Rex Tax Liens, LLC, Unknown Spouse of Martha Shelton, Commonwealth of Kentucky, County of Clinton and Martha Shelton
Not Classified By Court: Warning Order Attorney
Case Number: 1:2019cv00176
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , CROSSCLAIM against Martha Shelton by Commonwealth of Kentucky, County of Clinton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Little, Gary)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/19/2019 granting #5 Warning Order. Attorney Kevin L. Goff for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel; Defendants (CDF)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Martha Shelton served on 12/14/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Thompson, Travis)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Rex Tax Liens, LLC served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Thompson, Travis)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. LVNV Funding, LLC served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Thompson, Travis)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Commonwealth of Kentucky, County of Clinton served on 12/13/2019, answer due 1/3/2020. (Thompson, Travis)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment Unknown Spouse of Martha Shelton by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit AFF in Spt of MTN for WOA - Unk Spouse of Martha Shelton, #2 Proposed Order Proposed ORD for WOA - Unk Spouse of Martha Shelton) (Thompson, Travis)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 12/10/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Martha Shelton, Commonwealth of Kentucky, County of Clinton, LVNV Funding, LLC, Rex Tax Liens, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (CDF)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 IN REM COMPLAINT against Martha Shelton, Unknown Spouse of Martha Shelton, Commonwealth of Kentucky, County of Clinton, LVNV Funding, LLC, Rex Tax Liens, LLC, filed by United States of America. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3000978) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage and Re-Recorded Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Subsidy Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit, #5 Exhibit E - Death Certificate of Barbara Williams, #6 Exhibit F - Death Certificate of Johnny Wayne Williams, #7 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Descent, #8 Exhibit H - Clinton County Bail Bond Liens, #9 Exhibit I - LVNV Lien, #10 Exhibit J - Rex Tax Lien, #11 Cover Sheet) (CDF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Shelton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Tax Liens, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spouse of Martha Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Kentucky, County of Clinton
Represented By: Gary Alan Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Travis W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Warning Order Attorney
Represented By: Kevin L. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?