Bratcher et al v. Warren County School District et al
Plaintiff: Aimee Bratcher, Eric Bratcher and G.K.B.
Defendant: Warren County Board of Education, Warren County School District, Kentucky Department of Education and Kentucky Department of Education Office of Special Education and Early Learning
Case Number: 1:2020cv00058
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1415
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 6/4/2020 granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, re #9 . cc: Counsel (CDF)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 REDACTED DOCUMENT by G.K.B. re #9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by G.K.B.. (Chevalier, Marianne) Modified text on 5/20/2020 (CDF).
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 5/13/2020. The Plaintiffs filed a document (DN #9 ) which contains the full name of an individual who is identified as a minor. Pursuant to Rule 5.2(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, an electronic or paper filing with the court that contains the name of an individual known to be a minor may include only the minor's initials. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(a)(3). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to SEAL DN #9 . IT IS ORDERED that within 7 days the Plaintiffs shall file a redacted version of the document that includes a cover page entitled Notice of Filing and links this document to the originally filed document. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record (TJD)
May 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Non-Prisoner Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by G.K.B. Amendment to #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, pursuant to #8 Order, by G.K.B.. (Chevalier, Marianne) Modified event text and added link on 5/13/2020 (CDF).
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 4/29/2020 re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by G.K.B. Based upon the Court's review, the motion does not comply with Local Rule 5.4(b). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff G.K.B. shall file a completed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or an affidavit containing the same information in compliance with Local Rule 5.4(b) within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this order. cc: Counsel of record (CDF)
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #6 Notice of tendered Summons forms (CDF)
April 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing by Aimee Bratcher, Eric Bratcher, G.K.B. re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Chevalier, Marianne) Modified to add text on 4/15/2020 (CDF).
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff G.K.B. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chevalier, Marianne)
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing redacted exhibit by Aimee Bratcher, Eric Bratcher, G.K.B. re #1 Complaint, (Chevalier, Marianne) Modified to add text on 4/15/2020 (CDF).
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 4/7/2020.The Plaintiffs filed a document (DN 1-2) which contains the full name of an individual who is identified as a minor. Pursuant to Rule 5.2(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, an electronic or paper filing with the court that contains the name of an individual known to be a minor may include only the minor's initials. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(a)(3). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to SEAL DN 1-2 and is FURTHER DIRECTED to include only the minor's initials in the caption of the case on the court's electronic filing system. IT IS ORDERED that within 7 days the Plaintiffs shall file a redacted version of the document that includes a cover page entitled Notice of Filing and links this document to the originally filed document. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record (TJD)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Warren County Board of Education, Warren County School District, Kentucky Department of Education, Kentucky Department of Education Office of Special Education and Early Learning, filed by Eric Bratcher, Aimee Bratcher, G.K.B.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bratcher et al v. Warren County School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee Bratcher
Represented By: Marianne S. Chevalier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bratcher
Represented By: Marianne S. Chevalier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.K.B.
Represented By: Marianne S. Chevalier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky Department of Education Office of Special Education and Early Learning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?