Martin v. The Kroger Company
Plaintiff: Susanna Martin
Defendant: Kroger Company, The Kroger Company and Kroger Limited Partnership I
Case Number: 1:2020cv00072
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441wt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Kroger Limited Partnership I, The Kroger Company. (Ellis, Rudy)
May 28, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Kroger Limited Partnership I. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (SMJ)
May 28, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Kroger Company and Kroger Limited Partnership I, filed by Susanna Martin. (SMJ)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/27/2020 granting #6 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Amended Complaint tendered as Exhibit A is hereby filed and summons shall issue to be served upon Kroger Limited Partnership I. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 5/14/2020. Judge Justin R. Walker having recused from this matter; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED this action is REASSIGNED to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings for all further proceedings. Counsel shall change the case number to reflect the initials RGJ for all future filings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; Andrea Morgan (TJD)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNMENT by Judge Justin R. Walker on 5/13/2020. Judge Justin R. Walker RECUSES from this matter. IT IS ORDERED that this matter is TRANSFERRED to the Honorable Greg N. Stivers, Chief Judge, for REASSIGNMENT to another Judge. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, Traci Duff (MEJ)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 5/11/2020. Pursuant to 28 USC 455, the Court concludes that recusal in this case is required. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is reassigned to the docket of Judge Justin R. Walker for all further proceedings and disposition, pursuant to General Order 2019-09. Counsel are instructed to change the civil action number to reflect the initials (JRW) in place and instead of the initials (GNS) on all further pleadings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; Megan Jackson
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE Summons in a Civil Action by Susanna Martin re #6 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint (Broderick, David)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Susanna Martin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Summons to Kroger Limited Partnership I, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave) (Broderick, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2020: #4 Summons (Amended)) (JWM).
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (DN #1 ) by The Kroger Company. (Ellis, Rudy) Modified to add docket entry relationships on 4/30/2020 (JWM).
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (SMJ)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kroger Company. (SMJ)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (SMJ)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kroger Company from Warren Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00460, (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3088008), filed by Kroger Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - complaint & summons, #2 Exhibit - state court notice of removal, #3 Exhibit - docket, #4 Cover Sheet) (SMJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. The Kroger Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Company
Represented By: Rudy J. Ellis, III
Represented By: Faith C. Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Company
Represented By: Rudy J. Ellis, III
Represented By: Faith C. Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Represented By: Rudy J. Ellis, III
Represented By: Faith C. Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanna Martin
Represented By: David F. Broderick
Represented By: Brandon T. Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?