Reckart v. 1300 Campbell Lane Operating Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Gary Paul Reckart, Jr.
Defendant: 1300 Campbell Lane Operating Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00073
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441fl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 06/10/2020 granting #10 Motion to Remand to Warren Circuit Court. cc: Counsel; Warren Circuit Court, Case #20-CI-00461 (certified) (CDF)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 6/9/2020. The Plaintiff having filed a Motion to Remand and Defendant having filed a Response indicating no objection; IT IS ORDERED the Telephonic Scheduling Conference scheduled for 6/10/2020 is REMANDED from the Court's docket. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (KLL)
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by 1300 Campbell Lane Operating Company, LLC. (Goetz-Anderson, Jamie)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Gary Paul Reckart, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Gary Reckart, #2 Proposed Order Order granting Motion for remand) (Galloway, Ryan)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 4/30/2020. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl will conduct a telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 6/10/2020 at 10:00 am CDT. The Court will initiate the call. Meeting of the Parties required by Rule 26(f) due by 5/20/2020. Joint Meeting Report required by Rule 26(f) due by 6/3/2020. See Order for details. cc:counsel; KLL-Case Manager (JWM)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 4/30/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by 1300 Campbell Lane Operating Company, LLC. (Goetz-Anderson, Jamie)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL re #1 Notice of Removal from Warren Circuit Court, Civil Action No. 20-CI-00461. cc: Counsel; Warren Circuit Court (JWM)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1300 Campbell Lane Operating Company, LLC. (JWM)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan A. Davenport on behalf of 1300 Campbell Lane Operating Company, LLC (JWM)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson on behalf of 1300 Campbell Lane Operating Company, LLC (JWM)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 1300 Campbell Lane Operating Company, LLC from Warren Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00461. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-3088205 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B-Declaration of Douglas C. Yohe, #3 Cover Sheet) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reckart v. 1300 Campbell Lane Operating Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Paul Reckart, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy L. Edelen
Represented By: Ryan E. Galloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1300 Campbell Lane Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson
Represented By: Morgan A. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?