Shields v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Roger Darrell Shields
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00083
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Remark: Case transferred from Kentucky Western has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:20-cv-04206, filed 06/26/2020. (MLG)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 216 from ND/CA re MDL 2741. (KJA)
June 23, 2020 Case transferred to District of ND/CA. Case electronically transferred. (KJA)
May 18, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Joseph Anthony Osborne re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/4/2020. (KJA)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to J. Robert Bell, III re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/4/2020. (KJA)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (SRH)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (SRH)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3098196, filed by Roger Darrell Shields. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons tendered) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shields v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Darrell Shields
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Osborne
Represented By: Gary S. Logsdon
Represented By: J. Robert Bell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?