Wells et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Janet S. Wells and Marvin Wayne Wells, Jr.
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00090
Filed: May 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 41 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Michael Bonasso re #34 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/28/2020. (JM)
May 14, 2020 Filing 40 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Jon A. Strongman re #34 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/28/2020. (JM)
May 14, 2020 Filing 39 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Jeffrey L. Haberman re #34 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/28/2020. (JM)
May 14, 2020 Filing 38 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney James H. Keale re #34 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/28/2020. (JM)
May 14, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Eric M. Anielak re #34 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/28/2020. (JM)
May 14, 2020 Filing 36 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Charles Bland Patrick re #34 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/28/2020. (JM)
May 14, 2020 Filing 35 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JM)
May 14, 2020 Filing 34 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-24256. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (JM)
May 12, 2020 Filing 32 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 161 - BSC PTO-11 - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit ECF 184 - BSC PTO-13 - Stipulation for the Production of Docs and Electronically Stored Info, #3 Exhibit ECF 196 - BSC PTO-14 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, #4 Exhibit ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF 4955 - BSC PTO-175 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases, #7 Exhibit ECF 4987 - BSC PTO-176 (Notice of Correction of Error in PTO-175 - Wave 4), #8 Exhibit ECF 6100 - BSC PTO-187 - Amended Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4, #9 Exhibit ECF 6984 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Badylak, #10 Exhibit ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo of Law in Support of MTE Badylak, #11 Exhibit ECF 5033 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #12 Exhibit ECF 7067 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Badylak, #13 Exhibit ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #14 Exhibit ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Badylak, #15 Exhibit ECF 7004 - Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg and Memo, #16 Exhibit ECF 7088 - BSC_s Response in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #17 Exhibit ECF 7160 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #18 Exhibit ECF 6995 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Little, #19 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo of Law in Support of MTE Little, #20 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo of Law in Support of MTE Little - Exhibit A, #21 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo of Law in Support of MTE Little - Exhibit B, #22 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo of Law in Support of MTE Little - Exhibit C, #23 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo of Law in Support of MTE Little - Exhibit D, #24 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo of Law in Support of MTE Little - Exhibit E, #25 Exhibit ECF 5034 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Little, #26 Exhibit ECF 7066 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Little, #27 Exhibit ECF 4979 - Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Little, #28 Exhibit ECF 6044 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Little, #29 Exhibit ECF 7000 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Caraballo, #30 Exhibit ECF 4831 - Motion and Memo in Support of Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #31 Exhibit ECF 5029 - Pltf_s Reply to BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #32 Exhibit ECF 7001 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Caraballo, #33 Exhibit ECF 4832 - Motion and Memo in Support of Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #34 Exhibit ECF 5030 - Pltf_s Reply in BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #35 Exhibit ECF 7062 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Caraballo, #36 Exhibit ECF 4974 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #37 Exhibit ECF 7063 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Caraballo, #38 Exhibit ECF 4973 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #39 Exhibit ECF 6042 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Caraballo, #40 Exhibit ECF 6987 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Davies, #41 Exhibit ECF 4824 - Pltf_s Combined Memo and MTE Davies, #42 Exhibit ECF 5032 - Pltf_s Reply Memo in Support of MTE Davies, #43 Exhibit ECF 7052 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Davies, #44 Exhibit ECF 4975 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Davies, #45 Exhibit ECF 7011 - BSC_s Motion to Exclude Rosenzweig, MD., #46 Exhibit ECF 7037 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Rosenzweig, #47 Exhibit ECF 7085 - Pltf_s Response and Memo to BSC_s MTE Rosenzweig, #48 Exhibit ECF 7175 - BSC_s Reply in Support of MTE Rosenzweig, #49 Exhibit ECF 7002 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Blaivas, #50 Exhibit ECF 4822 - BSC_s Motion and Memo in Support of MTE Blaivas, #51 Exhibit ECF 7028 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Blaivas, #52 Exhibit ECF 7042 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Blaivas, #53 Exhibit ECF 4962 - Plaintiffss Opposition to MTE Blaivas, #54 Exhibit ECF 6029 - BSC-MDL - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Dr. Jerry Blaivas, #55 Exhibit ECF 7013 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Shull, #56 Exhibit ECF 4810 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Shull, #57 Exhibit ECF 7038 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Shull, #58 Exhibit ECF 7044 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Shull, #59 Exhibit ECF 4966 - Pltf_s Opp to Motion and Memo to Limit Testimony of Shull, #60 Exhibit ECF 6048 - Memo Opinion and Order re Shull, #61 Exhibit ECF 6033 - Memo Opinion and Order re Iakovlev, #62 Exhibit ECF 7015 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Iakovlev, #63 Exhibit ECF 4819 - BSC_s Motion to Strike and Exclude Iakovlev, #64 Exhibit ECF 7050 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Iakovlev, #65 Exhibit ECF 4959 - Pltf_s Response to BSC_s MTE Iakovlev, #66 Exhibit ECF 7009 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Guelcher, #67 Exhibit ECF 7030 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Guelcher, #68 Exhibit ECF 7057 - Pltf's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Guelcher, #69 Exhibit ECF 7166 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Reply in Support of MTE Guelcher, #70 Exhibit ECF 7010 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Mays, #71 Exhibit ECF 4805 - BSC_s Memo in Support of Motion to Exclude Mays, #72 Exhibit ECF 7033 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Mays, #73 Exhibit ECF 7065 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Mays, #74 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opposition MTE Mays, #75 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opposition MTE Mays - Exhibit 1, #76 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opposition MTE Mays - Exhibit 2, #77 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opposition MTE Mays - Exhibit 3, #78 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opposition MTE Mays - Exhibit 4, #79 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opposition MTE Mays - Exhibit 5, #80 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opposition MTE Mays - Exhibit 6, #81 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opposition MTE Mays - Exhibit 7, #82 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opposition MTE Mays - Exhibit 8, #83 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opposition MTE Mays - Exhibit 9, #84 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opposition MTE Mays - Exhibit 10, #85 Exhibit ECF 6036 - Memo Opinion and Order re Mays, #86 Exhibit ECF 7007 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Dunn, #87 Exhibit ECF 7058 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Dunn, #88 Exhibit ECF 7165 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Reply in Support of MTE Dunn, #89 Exhibit ECF 4807 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Limit Testimony Veronikis, #90 Exhibit ECF 4964 - Pltf_s Response and Memo in Opposition to MTE Veronikis, #91 Exhibit ECF 6051 - Memo Opinion and Order re Veronikis, #92 Exhibit ECF 7012 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Veronikis, #93 Exhibit ECF 7039 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Veronikis, #94 Exhibit ECF 7045 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Veronikis, #95 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Margolis, #96 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Margolis - Exhibit A, #97 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Margolis - Exhibit B, #98 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Margolis - Exhibit C, #99 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Margolis - Exhibit D, #100 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Margolis - Exhibit E, #101 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Margolis - Exhibit F, #102 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Margolis - Exhibit G, #103 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Margolis - Exhibit H, #104 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Margolis - Exhibit I, #105 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Margolis - Exhibit J, #106 Exhibit ECF 4960 - Pltf_s Response in Opposition to BSC_s MTE Margolis, #107 Exhibit ECF 7017 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Margolis, #108 Exhibit ECF 7032 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Margolis, #109 Exhibit ECF 7046 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Margolis, #110 Exhibit ECF 6035 - Memo Opinion and Order re Margolis, #111 Exhibit ECF 4821 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Ostergard, #112 Exhibit ECF 4961 - Pltf_s Response to BSC_s MTE Ostergard, #113 Exhibit ECF 7016 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Ostergard, #114 Exhibit ECF 7035 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Ostergard, #115 Exhibit ECF 7051 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Ostergard, #116 Exhibit ECF 6037 - Memo Opinion and Order re Ostergard, #117 Exhibit ECF 4818 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Galloway, #118 Exhibit ECF 4958 - Pltf_s Opp to MTE Galloway, #119 Exhibit ECF 7008 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Galloway, #120 Exhibit ECF 7048 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Galloway, #121 Exhibit ECF 6031 - Memo Opinion and Order re Galloway, #122 Exhibit ECF 4811 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Trepeta, #123 Exhibit ECF 4963 - Pltf_s Response in Opposition to BSC_s MTE Trepeta, #124 Exhibit ECF 7005 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Trepeta, #125 Exhibit ECF 7049 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Trepeta, #126 Exhibit ECF 6050 - Memo Opinion and Order re Trepeta, #127 Exhibit ECF 4815 - BSC_s Motion and Memo to Exclude Pence, #128 Exhibit ECF 4968 - Pltf_s Response in Opposition to BSC_s MTE Pence, #129 Exhibit ECF 5038 - BSC_s Reply Memo in Support of MTE Pence, #130 Exhibit ECF 7018 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Pence, #131 Exhibit ECF 7036 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Pence, #132 Exhibit ECF 7047 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Pence, #133 Exhibit ECF 6038 - Memo Opinion and Order re Pence, #134 Exhib
May 11, 2020 Filing 31 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) (Modified on 5/13/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 5/12/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 5/11/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/28/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 30 RESPONSE by Janet S. Wells, Marvin Wayne Wells, Jr in opposition to #29 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment and Integrated Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Anielak, Eric) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of all friends and family members identified in the Plaintiff Fact Sheet, including section VI. Fact Witnesses, and/or identified during the Plaintiff's deposition including but not limited to Marvin Wayne Wells, Chad Justin Wells and Thad Dustin Wells on dates and at times to be determined. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPE DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D. on October 17, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Kristin Dobay, M.D. by Janet S. Wells (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena)(Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Janet S. Wells of Kristin Dobay, M.D. on 09/21/2018 at 12:00 p.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
September 1, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Issuance of Subpoena to Kristin Dobay, M.D. by Janet S. Wells. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Rule 26 Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Anielak, Eric) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Janet S. Wells, Marvin Wayne Wells, Jr for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Janet S. Wells for Objections and Responses to Defendant's Interrogatories and Requests for Production. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 175. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 4 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Janet S. Wells, Marvin Wayne Wells, Jr for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 18 CROSS-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Janet S. Wells, Marvin Wayne Wells, Jr of Marvin Wells on May 31, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 17 CROSS-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Janet S. Wells, Marvin Wayne Wells, Jr of Janet Wells on May 31, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Marvin Wells on May 31, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Janet Wells on May 31, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Interrogatories and Request for Production. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Janet S. Wells, Marvin Wayne Wells, Jr for Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
April 6, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James H. Keale on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Janet S. Wells, Marvin Wayne Wells, Jr for Plaintiff Fact Sheet. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Janet S. Wells, Marvin Wayne Wells, Jr of Kristin Dobay, MD on 05/01/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (brn) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
June 21, 2017 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Janet S. Wells, Marvin Wayne Wells, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
January 20, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
January 29, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jeffrey L. Haberman on behalf of Janet S. Wells, Marvin Wayne Wells, Jr. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
October 22, 2013 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #2 Electronic Summons Issued,. Boston Scientific Corporation served on 10/11/2013, answer due 11/1/2013. (Patrick, Charles) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
October 10, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
October 3, 2013 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 56 (Order Amending PTO # 53 to Require Copies of Complaints Filed Under Delayed Filing Agreement) entered on 10/02/2013 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
October 2, 2013 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (tmh) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]
October 2, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2688901. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tmh) [Transferred from wvsd on 5/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman
Represented By: Eric M. Anielak
Represented By: James H. Keale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet S. Wells
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Haberman
Represented By: Charles Bland Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Wayne Wells, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Haberman
Represented By: Charles Bland Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?