Mello v. Allergan Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anna M. Mello
Defendant: Allergan Inc., McGhan Medical Corporation, Inamed Corporation, AbbVie Inc., AbbVie US LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc. and Venice Subsidiary, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00124
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Referring Judge: Justin R Walker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Remark: Case transferred from Kentucky Western has been opened in District of New Jersey [LIVE] as case 2:20-cv-11493, filed 08/26/2020. (MLG)
August 26, 2020 Case transferred to District of NJD. Case electronically transferred. (MLG)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 21 from NJD re:MDL 2921. (MLG)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Anna M. Mello. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: AbbVie US LLC's 2020 Annual Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Rob Michael's Comprehensive Report, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C: Rob Michael's Personal LinkedIn Resume, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D: Scott Reents' Comprehensive Report, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E: Scott Reents' Personal LinkedIn Resume, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F: Scott Reents' Asset Report, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G: Lindsey Bristow's Comprehensive Report, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H: Lindsey Bristow's Personal LinkedIn Resume, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I: Jennifer Lagunas' Comprehensive Report, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J: Jennifer Lagunas' Personal LinkedIn Resume) (Wood, Logan)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SHOW CAUSE ORDER by Judge Justin R. Walker on 7/28/2020. Defendant Abbvie US LLC's citizenship is the citizenship of each of its members. Delay v. Rosenthal Collins Grp., LLC, 585 F.3d 1003, 1005 (6th Cir. 2009). Thus, "the court needs to know the citizenship of each member of" Abbvie US LLC. Id. Mello's deadline for addressing this jurisdictional deficiency is August 21, 2020. cc: Counsel; Defendants (CDF)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 7/27/2020. Pursuant to 28 USC 455, the Court concludes that recusal in this case is required. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is reassigned to the docket of Judge Justin R. Walker for all further proceedings and disposition, pursuant to General Order 2019-09. Counsel are instructed to change the civil action number to reflect the initials (JRW) in place and instead of the initials (GNS) on all further pleadings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; Megan Jackson (TJD)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to AbbVie Inc., AbbVie US LLC, Allergan Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Venice Subsidiary, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AbbVie Inc., AbbVie US LLC, Allergan Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Venice Subsidiary, LLC, filed by Anna M. Mello. Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-3146609. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mello v. Allergan Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGhan Medical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inamed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venice Subsidiary, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna M. Mello
Represented By: Tad Thomas
Represented By: Logan M. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?