Shambaugh & Son, L.P. v. Texo Industrial, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shambaugh & Son, L.P.
Defendant: Carrie Lynn O'Neal, Darrell Edward O'Neal and Texo Industrial, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00135
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AGREED ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 9/23/2020 granting #9 Proposed Agreed Order. The Defendants' responsive pleading deadline to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to 11/9/2020. cc: Counsel (JM)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order extending deadline to file responsive pleading by Carrie Lynn O'Neal, Darrell Edward O'Neal, Texo Industrial, LLC. (Bumgarner, Kyle)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Thomason on behalf of Carrie Lynn O'Neal, Darrell Edward O'Neal, Texo Industrial, LLC (Thomason, Richard)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle G. Bumgarner on behalf of Carrie Lynn O'Neal, Darrell Edward O'Neal, Texo Industrial, LLC (Bumgarner, Kyle)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE from Secretary of State of inability to process Summons to Texo Industrial, LLC, re #4 Summons Issued. (Attachments: #1 issued Summons to Texo Industrial marked received by Secretary of State (attached service documents also received but not scanned)) (CDF)
August 27, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Summons Returned Executed; Error: Incorrect docketing event selected. Document should have been filed using the Return of Service event.; Correction: Docket text edited as follows: "Return of Service on the Secretary of State as to Texo Industrial, LLC." Answer due date deleted, as answer due date is not calculated until the Secretary of States makes a return of service on defendant. (CDF)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service on the Secretary of State as to Texo Industrial, LLC. (Geisen, William) Modified event text on 8/27/2020 (CDF).
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Carrie Lynn O'Neal, Darrell Edward O'Neal, and Texo Industrial, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. (SRH)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate EMCOR Group, Inc. for Shambaugh & Son, L.P. (SRH)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (SRH)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carrie Lynn O'Neal, Darrell Edward O'Neal, and Texo Industrial, LLC., filed by Shambaugh & Son, L.P. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3158043. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Subcontract, #2 Exhibit 2- Affidavit and Waiver of Lien, #3 Exhibit 3- Affidavit and Waiver of Lien, #4 Cover Sheet, #5 Summons tendered) (SRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shambaugh & Son, L.P. v. Texo Industrial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shambaugh & Son, L.P.
Represented By: William G. Geisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrie Lynn O'Neal
Represented By: Kyle G. Bumgarner
Represented By: Richard A. Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Edward O'Neal
Represented By: Kyle G. Bumgarner
Represented By: Richard A. Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texo Industrial, LLC
Represented By: Kyle G. Bumgarner
Represented By: Richard A. Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?