Stephenson et al v. Tri-County Electric Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Stephenson and Madeline Stephenson
Defendant: Tri-County Electric Company, Inc., Seelbach and Company, LLC and Tri-County Electric Membership Corporation doing business as Tri-County Electric
Case Number: 1:2020cv00139
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1446tl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE Of Service by Kyle Stephenson, Madeline Stephenson (Carroll, Thomas)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Seelbach and Company, LLC. (Pernice, Anthony)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 10/2/2020. Due to the exigencies of the Court's docket; IT IS ORDERED the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 10:30 is RESCHEDULED to be conducted on 10/15/2020 at 2:30 pm, CDT, before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The Court will initiate the call. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (KLL)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Kyle Stephenson, Madeline Stephenson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Carroll, Thomas)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Seelbach and Company, LLC. Corporate Parent: W.A. Kendall & Company, Inc. for Seelbach and Company, LLC. (Pernice, Anthony) Modified to add corporate parent on 8/28/2020 (CDF).
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (EBOC) by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 8/26/2020 - Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 10:30 a.m. CDT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. cc: Counsel of Record, Kelly Lovell (KD)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 8/26/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Amended Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal with Complaint and Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Tri-County Electric Membership Corporation. (Cassis, Charles) Modified to add link and edit text on 8/25/2020 (CDF).
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Cumberland Circuit Court and counsel, re #1 Notice of Removal. (CDF)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tri-County Electric Membership Corporation. (CDF)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF)
August 20, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint and Amended Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal (See State Court Pleadings at DN #1 -1) with Jury Demand by Seelbach and Company, LLC. (CDF)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Tri-County Electric Membership Corporation from Cumberland Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00038. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-3165933). (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Cover Sheet) (CDF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephenson et al v. Tri-County Electric Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-County Electric Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seelbach and Company, LLC
Represented By: Anthony M. Pernice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-County Electric Membership Corporation doing business as Tri-County Electric
Represented By: Charles H. Cassis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Stephenson
Represented By: Lance W. Turner
Represented By: Thomas E. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline Stephenson
Represented By: Lance W. Turner
Represented By: Thomas E. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?