Ruhe v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kimberly G. Ruhe
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00145
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441eb
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Kimberly G. Ruhe. (Hagerman, Bartley)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 9/8/2020 granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Braxton S. Thrash. cc: Counsel (CDF)
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Braxton S. Thrash to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3177987. by Defendant Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Braxton S. Thrash, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Thrash, Braxton)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 9/1/2020 granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William B. Wahlheim, Jr. cc: Counsel (CDF)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 9/1/2020; If the parties would like a telephonic scheduling conference, the request shall be made to the Magistrate Judge's Case Manager, Kelly Lovell, at 270-393-2507. Unless the parties request a conference, the Court will prepare a scheduling order based upon the parties' report and enter the order of record. Parties shall conduct the meeting required by Rule 26(f) no later than 9/16/2020 and file their Rule 26 Meeting Report by 9/30/2020. (Review Order in full for specifics, including further directives.) cc: Counsel; KL (CDF)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-3172814. by Defendant Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of William Wahlheim, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Wahlheim, William)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 8/28/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Casey Circuit Court (DLW)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliates The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Delaware, Hartford Holdings, Inc., and Hartford Life, Inc. for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (DLW)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (DLW)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company from Casey Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00080. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-3167526). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B Plan Documents, #3 Cover Sheet) (DLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruhe v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Braxton S. Thrash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly G. Ruhe
Represented By: Bartley K. Hagerman
Represented By: Philip G. Fairbanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?