Califar et al v. BNX, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Califar
Defendant: Todd Whitkanack and BNX, LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: Crete Carrier Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00164
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 mv
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD OF ATTORNEY RONALD J. MAURER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/18/2020 granting #11 Motion for Leave to withdraw. cc: Counsel (CDF)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/9/2020. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 11/30/2020. Plaintiff and Intervening Plaintiff Joinder of Parties and Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2021. Defendants Joinder of Parties and Amended Pleadings due by 5/31/2021. Pretrial Fact Discovery due by 8/31/2021. Expert Witness (Plaintiff & Intervening Plaintiff) due by 4/30/2021, with rebuttal due 7/30/2021. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 6/30/2021. Expert Discovery depositions due by 8/31/2021. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 9:30 AM CT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Dispositive Motions and Daubert Motions due by 8/31/2021. (Review Order in full for specifics, including discovery guidelines.) cc: Counsel (CDF)
November 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel of Record of Attorney Ronald J. Maurer by Plaintiff Timothy Califar (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vaughn, Jay)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/5/2020 re #7 Attorney Notice of Deficiency to Ronald J. Maurer. Attorney Ronald J. Maurer shall SHOW CAUSE within 21 days of the entry of this Order why the Court should not strike him as counsel of record in this case for his failure to seek admission pro hac vice in accordance with LR 83.2. cc: Counsel; Attorney Ronald J. Maurer (CDF)
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by BNX, LLC, Todd Whitkanack. (Stevens, Thomas)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crete Carrier Corporation. (Walker, Timothy)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Ronald J. Maurer re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 10/26/2020. (KJA)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (EBOC) by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 9/29/2020: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/2/2020.cc: counsel, KL (JM)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 9/29/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: counsel of record, Hart County Circuit Court (SRH)
September 24, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BNX, LLC and Todd Whitkanack, previously filed in state court action. (SRH)
September 23, 2020 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (SRH)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BNX, LLC. (SRH)
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, by Todd Whitkanack, from Hart County Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00111. ( Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3190837). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- SOS Printout, #2 Exhibit 2- email of counsel for Crete, #3 Exhibit 3- state court record, #4 Cover Sheet) (SRH) Modified on 9/24/2020 (SRH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Califar et al v. BNX, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Whitkanack
Represented By: Anna C. Zwicky
Represented By: Thomas E. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNX, LLC
Represented By: Anna C. Zwicky
Represented By: Thomas E. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Califar
Represented By: Ronald J. Maurer
Represented By: Jay R. Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Crete Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Timothy J. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?