Easterling v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Cleve Easterling
Defendant: William J. Jones and Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00182
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 mv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER signed by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 12/18/2020. The Motion to Dismiss at DN #4 having been withdrawn from the docket; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the "Motion for Continuance" (DN #5 ) requesting a continuance to respond to DN 4 is denied as moot. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel of Record (TJD)
December 17, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by William J. Jones, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B to Motion to Dismiss) (Burroughs, Rebecca)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED ORDER REMANDING by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 12/15/2020. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (DN #4 ) filed on 10/30/2020 is hereby remanded.cc:counsel (JWM)
December 9, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Remand Motion to Dismiss (DN #4 ) by Defendants William J. Jones, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Joint Motion to Remand) (Burroughs, Rebecca) Modified to add link on 12/10/2020 (CDF).
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cleve Easterling. (Goetz, Lindsey)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO REMAND by William J. Jones, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Burroughs, Rebecca)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants William J. Jones, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss) (Burroughs, Rebecca)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cleve Easterling. (Goetz, Lindsey) Modified to add text on 11/10/2020 (JWM).
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Continue Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Cleve Easterling (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (May, Justin)
October 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants William J. Jones, Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schmidt v ABF, #2 Exhibit B - Goldfarb v Elite, #3 Exhibit C - Fuel Transport, #4 Exhibit D - Odor v Walmart, #5 Exhibit E - Odor v Walmart, #6 Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss) (Burroughs, Rebecca)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Warren Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 20-CI-1117. cc: Counsel; Warren Circuit Court (JWM)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by William J. Jones and Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc. from Warren Circuit Court, Case Number 20-CI-1117. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-3211950 ) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Original Complaint) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easterling v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Jones
Represented By: Gene F. Zipperle, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca L. Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Dominion Freight Line, Inc.
Represented By: Gene F. Zipperle, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca L. Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleve Easterling
Represented By: Lindsey C. Goetz
Represented By: Justin B. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?