Coates v. Certainteed, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Spencer Coates
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation and Certainteed, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00192
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 1/6/2021: The Court having been advised that settlement has been reached on all matters in this case IT IS ORDERED this case is Dismissed without prejudice and stricken from the active docket. The parties shall tender an agreed order dismissing this case with prejudice within forty-five (45) days of entry of this Order. The Court will entertain a motion to redocket this action upon application to this Court within forty-five (45) days from entry of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record (TJD)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 1/5/2021. The parties having advised the Court they have reached an amicable resolution of all claims in this case; IT IS ORDERED the Telephonic Scheduling Conference scheduled for 1/12/2021 is REMANDED from the Court's docket. The parties shall submit appropriate settlement documents to Chief Judge Stivers for his consideration. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, Traci Duff (KLL)
December 31, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of withdrawal of counsel by Spencer Coates (Church, Seth)
December 30, 2020 Schedules set (JWM)
December 18, 2020 Filing 11 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Spencer Coates. (Edelen, Timothy)
December 15, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Spencer Coates. (Edelen, Timothy)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 12/2/2020. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl will conduct a telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 1/12/2021 at 11:00 am CST/12:00 pm EST. The Court will initiate the call. Meeting of the parties required by Rule 26(f) is due by 12/22/2020. Written joint report due by 1/5/2021. See Order for specifics. cc:counsel; KL-Case Manager (JWM)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 12/1/2020. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl will conduct a telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 1/12/2021 at 11:00 am CST/12:00 pm EST. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. Meeting of the parties required by Rule 26(f) due by 1/5/2021. Written joint report due by 12/22/2020. See Order for specifics.cc:counsel; KL-Case Manager (JWM) Modified to add text on 12/2/2020 (JWM).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 11/30/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION Re:PDF Error: INCORRECT document attached to docket entry by efiler re: #5 Answer to Complaint ; Correct document attached to this entry. (Crawford, Steven)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Certainteed, LLC. (Crawford, Steven) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/23/2020) (MLG).
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Warren Circuit Court, Civil Action No. 20-CI-01229. cc: Counsel; Warren Circuit Court (JWM)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Compagnie de Saint-Gobain, Corporate Parent Saint-Gobain Corporation, Corporate Parent CertainTeed Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Saint-Gobain Delaware Corporation, Corporate Parent Societe de Participations Financieres et Industrielles for Certainteed, LLC. (JWM)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Certainteed, LLC from Warren Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-01229. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-3227492 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Filings, #2 Cover Sheet) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coates v. Certainteed, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Coates
Represented By: Timothy L. Edelen
Represented By: Seth T. Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Represented By: Allison W. Weyand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Crawford
Represented By: Allison W. Weyand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?