Rubio et al v. DZ Moving and Storage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anita Rubio
Defendant: Dominic Truitt, John Christner Trucking, LLC, DZ Moving and Storage, LLC, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Terron Scott
Case Number: 1:2020cv00198
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 mv
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by John Christner Trucking, LLC, Terron Scott. (Reinhardt, Samuel)
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Defendants Service of Discovery Responses by John Christner Trucking, LLC, Terron Scott (Vance, Palmer)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 12/1/2020; Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2021 at 10:30 AM CT/11:30 AM ET before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. Parties shall conduct meeting required by Rule 26(f) by 12/28/2020 and file their Rule 26 Meeting Report by 1/8/2021. (Review Order for specifics.) cc: Counsel; KL (CDF)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Christner Trucking, LLC. (Vance, Palmer) Modified to remove filer on 12/1/2020 (CDF).
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Amended Notice of Removal by John Christner Trucking, LLC, Terron Scott re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1-1 Redacted State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit 1-2 Redacted State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit 2- State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Vance, Palmer)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 11/25/2020; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 11/23/2020. The Defendant John Christner Trucking, LLC filed documents (DN 1, DN 1-1, DN 1-2) which contain the full name of an individual who is identified as a minor. Pursuant to Rule 5.2(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, an electronic or paper filing with the court that contains the name of an individual known to be a minor may include only the minor's initials. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(a)(3). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to SEAL DN 1, DN 1-1, and DN 1-2 and is FURTHER DIRECTED to include only the minor's initials in the caption of the case on the court's electronic filing system. IT IS ORDERED that within 7 days of the entry date of this Order the Defendant John Christner Trucking, LLC shall file a redacted version of the document that includes a cover page entitled Notice of Filing and links this document to the originally filed documents. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record (TJD)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Clinton Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 20-CI-00062. cc: Counsel; Clinton Circuit Court (JWM)
November 20, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint and Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Dominic Truitt. (See DN #1 ) (JWM)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Christner Trucking, LLC, Terron Scott from Clinton Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00062. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-3230929 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Documents Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1-State Court Documents Part 2, #3 Exhibit 2-State Court Notice of Removal, #4 Cover Sheet) (JWM) Modified on 12/1/2020 to refer to DN #6 Amended (and redacted) Notice of Removal (CDF).
November 20, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint and Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by DZ Moving and Storage, LLC (See DN #1 ). (JWM)
November 20, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint and Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Terron Scott (See DN #1 ). (JWM)
November 20, 2020 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (DN #1 ). (JWM) Modified to add text on 11/23/2020 (JWM).
November 20, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint and Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by John Christner Trucking, LLC (See DN #1 ). (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubio et al v. DZ Moving and Storage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Truitt
Represented By: Marc L. Breit
Represented By: Scott E. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Christner Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Palmer G. Vance, II
Represented By: Samuel T. Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DZ Moving and Storage, LLC
Represented By: Marc L. Breit
Represented By: Scott E. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: John T. Pruitt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terron Scott
Represented By: Palmer G. Vance, II
Represented By: Samuel T. Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Rubio
Represented By: Timothy R. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?