Scholz v. Wickering et al
Plaintiff: David G. Scholz
Defendant: Van Eerden Trucking Co., Unknown Defendant and Mark Allen Wickering
Case Number: 1:2021cv00044
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 4/27/2021. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 5/31/2021. Joinder of Parties and Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2021. Pretrial Fact Discovery due by 5/31/2022. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 11/1/2021. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 12/31/2021. Expert Discovery depositions due by 3/31/2022. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/6/2022 at 10:00 AM CT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Dispositive Motions and Daubert Motions due by 6/30/2022. (Review Order in full for specifics.) cc: Counsel (CDF)
April 16, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Mark Allen Wickering. (Casey, Michael)
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Mark Allen Wickering, Van Eerden Trucking Co.. (Casey, Michael) Modified to add filer on 3/31/2021 (CDF).
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 3/17/2021. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl will conduct a telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 4/27/2021 at 9:30 am CDT/10:10 am EDT. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel for the parties shall conduct a meeting of the parties by 4/6/2021. Counsel for the parties shall file the written joint report by 4/20/2021. See Order for details. cc:counsel; KLL-Case Manager (JWM)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 3/17/2021; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE CIVIL COVER SHEET by Van Eerden Trucking Co., Mark Allen Wickering re #1 Notice of Removal, (Casey, Michael)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Van Eerden Trucking Co.. (Casey, Michael)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Simpson Circuit Court, Civil Action N. 20-CI-00312. cc: Counsel; Simpson Circuit Court (JWM)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mark Allen Wickering, Van Eerden Trucking Co. from Simpson Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00312. ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 0644-3304686 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Counsel, #3 Exhibit C-Correspondence, #4 Exhibit D-Simpson Circuit Court File) (JWM)
March 12, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Van Eerden Trucking Co., Mark Allen Wickering. (See DN #1 to view PDF) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scholz v. Wickering et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David G. Scholz
Represented By: Michael K. Nisbet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Eerden Trucking Co.
Represented By: Michael P. Casey
Represented By: Emily S. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Allen Wickering
Represented By: Michael P. Casey
Represented By: Emily S. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?