Shinkle v. Hopkinsville Elevator Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Leo Shinkle
Defendant: Hopkinsville Elevator Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00076
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 6/28/2021; Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2021 at 10:30 AM CT/11:30 AM ET before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Counsel who will try the case shall participate in the conference. Parties shall conduct meeting required by Rule 26(f) by 7/16/2021 and file their Rule 26 Meeting Report by 7/30/2021. cc: Counsel; KL (CDF)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 6/28/2021; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hopkinsville Elevator Co., Inc.. (Edelen, Timothy)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hopkinsville Elevator Co., Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Hopkinsville Elevator Co., Inc., filed by Leo Shinkle. Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 0644-3342011. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shinkle v. Hopkinsville Elevator Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopkinsville Elevator Co., Inc.
Represented By: Timothy L. Edelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Shinkle
Represented By: Bernard R. Mazaheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?