Lindsey et al v. Dexterous Mold and Tool, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joann Lindsey and Carl Lindsey
Defendant: Van Dorn Demag Corporation, Sumitomo (SHI) Demag Plastics Machinery GmbH, Sumitomo (SHI) Demag Plastics Machinery North America, Inc. and Dexterous Mold and Tool, Inc.
Intervenor Plaintiff: Old Republic Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00078
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #13 Intervenor Complaint by Dexterous Mold and Tool, Inc.. (Cook, Matthew)
July 9, 2021 Filing 13 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT, filed by Old Republic Insurance Company. (JWM)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 7/8/2021 granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Intervening Complaint. cc: Counsel(JWM)
June 15, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Leave to File Intervening Complaint filed by Dexterous Mold and Tool, Inc.. (Cook, Matthew)
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Carl Lindsey (Ashlock, Larry)
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE Corporate Disclosure Statement by Old Republic Insurance Company (Wimsatt, Brian) Modified text on 5/25/2021 (CDF).
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Intervening Complaint by Intervenor Plaintiff Old Republic Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wimsatt, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2021: #2 tendered Intervening Complaint) (CDF). Modified text on 5/25/2021 (CDF).
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 ERROR: DOCKETED AS SEPARATE DOCUMENT; Document now attached to DN #8 . (CDF)
May 25, 2021 Corporate Disclosure Statement (See DN #9 to view PDF document.) by Old Republic Insurance Company. (CDF)
May 25, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 7 Intervenor Complaint, #9 Notice (Other); Error: Intervening Complaint should have been filed as an attachment to the Motion for Leave to File (DN #8 ). Corporate Disclosure Statement filed using incorrect docketing event.; Correction: Intervening Complaint filed/attached at DN 7 removed/terminated and attached to the Motion for Leave to File (DN #8 ). Party role changed to "Intervenor - Pending." Corporate Disclosure Statement event docketed with a link to DN #9 . (CDF)
May 17, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dexterous Mold and Tool, Inc.. (Cook, Matthew)
May 17, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal by Dexterous Mold and Tool, Inc.. (Cook, Matthew) Modified to add link on 5/18/2021 (CDF).
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE Consent to #1 Notice of Removal by Sumitomo (SHI) Demag Plastics Machinery North America, Inc. (English, Charles) Modified to add link and text on 5/18/2021 (CDF).
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Butler Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 21-CI-00038. cc: Counsel; Butler Circuit Court (JWM)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dexterous Mold and Tool, Inc. from Butler Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00038. ( Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 0644-3342849 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Georgia Secretary of State Business Information, #2 Exhibit B-Kentucky Secretary of State Business Information, #3 Exhibit C-State Court Pleadings Filed to Date, #4 Cover Sheet) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey et al v. Dexterous Mold and Tool, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Dorn Demag Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumitomo (SHI) Demag Plastics Machinery GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumitomo (SHI) Demag Plastics Machinery North America, Inc.
Represented By: Charles E. English, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexterous Mold and Tool, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas N. Kerrick
Represented By: Matthew Porter Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Lindsey
Represented By: Larry D. Ashlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Lindsey
Represented By: Larry D. Ashlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Old Republic Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian D. Wimsatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?