Richardson et al v. Groves et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Richardson and Rebekah Richardson
Defendant: Corey Groves, Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. and Speedco Truck Lube, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00114
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Corey Groves, Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc., Speedco Truck Lube, Inc.. (Rives, Robert)
September 8, 2021 Schedules set (JWM)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 8/26/2021. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl will conduct a telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 10/19/2021 at 10:00 am CDT/11:00 am EDT. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel for the parties shall conduct a meeting of the parties by 9/28/2021. Counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report by 10/12/2021. See Order for details. cc:counsel; KL-Case Manager (JWM)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 8/26/2021; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
August 24, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc., Speedco Truck Lube, Inc.. (Rives, Robert)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Corey Groves, Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc., Speedco Truck Lube, Inc.. (Rives, Robert)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Corey Groves, Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc., Speedco Truck Lube, Inc.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Corey Groves, Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc., Speedco Truck Lube, Inc., filed by Rebekah Richardson(Individually), Christopher Richardson (Individually), Rebekah Richardson(in her capacity as Parent and Next Friend of R.A.R., a minor), Rebekah Richardson(in her capacity as Parent and Next Friend of A.J.R., a minor), Rebekah Richardson(in her capacity as Parent and Next Friend of A.T.R., a minor). Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0644-3394275. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson et al v. Groves et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Richardson
Represented By: Lee L. Coleman
Represented By: Richard W. Hartsock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Richardson
Represented By: Lee L. Coleman
Represented By: Richard W. Hartsock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Groves
Represented By: Robert C. Rives, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Rives, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedco Truck Lube, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Rives, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?