Cage v. NTT Data, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ricky Cage
Defendant: NTT Data, Inc. and NTT Data Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00122
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 fm
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by NTT Data Services, LLC. (Carter, John)
October 1, 2021 Filing 11 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by NTT Data Services, LLC. (Carter, John) Modified to correct defendant name on 10/14/2021 (TJD).
September 30, 2021 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against NTT Data, Inc., filed by Ricky Cage. (JWM)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED ORDER AMENDING COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 9/30/2021 granting #8 Proposed Agreed Order. Plaintiff's attached First Amended Complaint is deemed as filed as of the date of this Order. NTT Data Services, LLC shall have 14 days from entry of this Order to file its Answer. cc: Counsel(JWM)
September 30, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Agreed Order to Amend Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint) by Ricky Cage. (Bucher, Anthony)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent NTT Data International, LLC, Other Affiliate NTT Data Corporation, Other Affiliate NTT Data Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Nippon Telegraph & Telephone Corporation for NTT Data, Inc.. by NTT Data, Inc.. (Carter, John)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 9/9/2021. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl will conduct a telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 10/21/2021 at 9:30 am CDT/10:30 am EDT. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel for the parties shall conduct a meeting of the parties by 9/30/2021. Counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report by 10/14/2021. See Order for details. cc:counsel; KL-Case Manager (JWM)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 9/8/2021; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (DN #1 ) by NTT Data, Inc.. (Inman, J.) Modified to add docket entry relationships on 9/8/2021 (JWM).
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE to Warren Circuit Court and counsel, re #1 Notice of Removal (CDF)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Warren Circuit Court, Division II, case number 21-CI-00890, filed by NTT Data, Inc. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0644-3403347) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Cover Sheet) (CDF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cage v. NTT Data, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Cage
Represented By: Anthony J. Bucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NTT Data, Inc.
Represented By: J. Andrew Inman
Represented By: John M.S. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NTT Data Services, LLC
Represented By: J. Andrew Inman
Represented By: John M.S. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?