Garmon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Beth Garmon
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv00130
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint,. Social Security Notice due by 9/29/2021. (JWM)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summonses, USM 285 Forms, Complaint, and Order forwarded to USMS via KYW-USMS-ORDERS for service. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Forms) (JWM)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 9/7/2021 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to file Plaintiff's complaint and issue summons. The USMS is directed to serve the summons with a copy of the complaint and this Order on Defendants. The USMS shall advance the cost of service. cc: Counsel(JWM)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. (DeW)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Beth Garmon (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (DeW)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Beth Garmon. (Attachments: #1 TENDERED Summons Social Security Administration, #2 TENDERED Summons US Attorney General, #3 TENDERED Summons US Attorney, #4 USM-285-SSA, #5 USM-285-US Attorney General, #6 USM-285-US Attorney, #7 Cover Sheet) (DeW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garmon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Garmon
Represented By: Mary G. Burchett-Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy D. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?